Thomas v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Rose Thomas
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv06000
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 451
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Telephone conference held. Plaintiff's amended complaint is due by 2/4/2022. Joint status report is due no later than 2/14/2022. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 12/20/2021. Mailed notice (aee, )
December 17, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rose Thomas by Navarrio Douglas Wilkerson (Wilkerson, Navarrio)
December 17, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rose Thomas by Gianna Rochelle Scatchell (Scatchell, Gianna)
December 6, 2021 Filing 4 Statement Regarding Initiating Complaint by Ford Motor Company (Smith, Katherine)
November 22, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Defendant's motion to strike and for status conference #2 is granted in part and denied in part without prejudice. This case is set for a telephonic status hearing on 12/20/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Participants should use the Court's toll-free, call-in number 877-336-1829. Plaintiff should be prepared at that time to address which claims she wishes to pursue from the complaint filed on her behalf at Judge Pacold's direction. After Plaintiff identifies those claims, the Court will either direct her to file an amended complaint or it will simply dismiss any claims that Plaintiff chooses not to pursue. If after that discussion, Defendant believes that Plaintiff is trying to pursue claims that are no longer viable because of issue or claim preclusion or for any other reason, it may either file a motion to dismiss or renew its motion to strike. Emailed notice (cdh, )
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION by Defendant Ford Motor Company to strike complaint, #1 and Request for a Status Conference (Nemechek, Kathleen)
November 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Rose Thomas; (Attachments: #1 Exhibits Group 1, #2 Exhibits Group 2, #3 Exhibits Group 3, #4 Exhibits Group 4, #5 Exhibits Group 5, #6 Exhibits Group 6, #7 Exhibits Group 7, #8 Pacold Order 14cv4708)(exr, )
November 9, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (exr, )
November 9, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (exr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Thomas
Represented By: Gianna Rochelle Scatchell
Represented By: Navarrio Douglas Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Derek Grady Barella
Represented By: Jocelyn A Villanueva
Represented By: Katherine V.A. Smith
Represented By: Kathleen M Nemechek PHV
Represented By: Michael A Jaskiw
Represented By: Molly T Senger
Represented By: Stephen M Bledsoe
Represented By: Timothy Scott Millman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?