Bridges v. Stateville Correctional Center
Plaintiff: Andre Lewis Bridges
Defendant: Stateville Correctional Center
Case Number: 1:2021cv06002
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Plaintiff has paid the statutory filing fee, as ordered 9 Summons, however, shall not issue. Plaintiff's amended complaint #8 is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. If Plaintiff wants to proceed with this lawsuit, he must submit an amended complaint that states a federal claim against proper defendants. Failure to submit an amended complaint by February 4, 2022, will result in dismissal of this lawsuit for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 is denied. This case is in its early stages, and there is nothing before this Court that suggests that Plaintiff is unable to address his fee status (in accordance with the Court's July 22, 2021 order) without a lawyer. See Pickett v. Chicago Transit Auth., 930 F.3d 869, 871 (7th Cir. 2019) (motions for attorney representation are properly denied when it is too early in the case to determine whether the plaintiff can represent himself adequately). Additionally, Plaintiff gives no indication he attempted to obtain counsel on his own. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007) (en banc); Russell v. Bukowski, 608 F.App'x 426, 428 (7th Cir. 2015) ("[B]efore a district court is required to consider recruiting counsel to assist a litigant in a civil case, the litigant must make a reasonable attempt to secure counsel for himself."). The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff an amended complaint form, a blank USM-285 form, and instructions along with a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 1/7/2022. Mailed Notice.(gcy, )
January 7, 2022 MAILED copy of Order dated 1/7/22 with Amended Complaint Form/USM-285 and Insructions to Andre Lewis Bridges. (gcy, )
December 16, 2021 Filing 10 LETTER from Andre L. Bridges dated 11/23/21. (No Envelope postmark date). (gcy, )
November 23, 2021 MAILED copy of the Clerk's Notice entry along with the Joint Consent Form to Plaintiff Andre Lewis Bridges. (gcy, )
November 16, 2021 Filing 8 RECEIVED Amended Complaint and by Andre Lewis Bridges. (Attachments). (gcy, )
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied without prejudice. If Plaintiff wants to proceed with this lawsuit, he must either (1) submit a renewed application that is signed by him, certified by an appropriate official, and accompanied by a copy of Plaintiff's trust fund statement showing all transactions in his account for the six-month period immediately preceding his initiation of this action; or (2) pay the full statutory filing fee of $402.00. Failure to comply with this order by December 10, 2021, will result in summary dismissal of this case. The Clerk is directed to add Plaintiff's Inmate Identification Number (#M-44731) to the identification information on the docket. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 11/12/2021. Mailed notice(gcy, )
November 10, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment.. (rc, )
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Andre Lewis Bridges. (rc, )
November 9, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Andre Lewis Bridges for attorney representation. (rc, )
November 9, 2021 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Andre Lewis Bridges for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (rc, )
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (rc, )
November 9, 2021 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and by Andre Lewis Bridges. (Exhibits) (rc, )
November 9, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (rc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bridges v. Stateville Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Lewis Bridges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stateville Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?