Kallemeyn Collision Center, Inc. et al v. The Standard Fire Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Kallemeyn Collision Center, Inc. and Jeff Kallemeyn
Defendant: The Standard Fire Insurance Company and The Travelers Indemnity Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv06004
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION by Plaintiff Kallemeyn Collision Center, Inc. for extension of time to file response/reply as to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #10 (McGuire, Patrick)
December 16, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM by The Standard Fire Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #10 Corrected (Orlando, Thomas)
December 16, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Defendant's motion for leave to file a corrected memorandum of law in support of its motion to dismiss counts II through IX of plaintiffs' complaint #13 is granted. Mailed notice(maf)
December 16, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendants The Standard Fire Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company for leave to file Corrected Memorandum of Law in support of its Motion to Dismiss Counts II through IX of Plaintiffs' Complaint (Orlando, Thomas)
December 16, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Defendants' motion to dismiss #10 is entered and briefed as follows: response by 1/7/22, reply by 1/21/22. Telephone Conference set for 12/21/21 and the filing of a joint status report is vacated. The Court will rule by mail. Mailed notice(maf)
December 15, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM by The Standard Fire Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #10 (Orlando, Thomas)
December 15, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants The Standard Fire Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company (Orlando, Thomas)
December 15, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by The Standard Fire Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company(Orlando, Thomas)
December 15, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Unopposed motion for extension of time to 12/15/21 to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint #6 is granted. Motion for leave to file excess pages #7 is granted. Mailed notice(maf)
December 14, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendants The Standard Fire Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company for leave to file excess pages (Orlando, Thomas)
December 14, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION by Defendants The Standard Fire Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company for extension of time to file answer regarding notice of removal, #1 Unopposed (Orlando, Thomas)
November 12, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Motion for extension of time to 12/14/21 to answer #4 is granted. Telephone Conference set for 12/21/21 at 9:45 a.m. Joint status report shall be filed by 12/16/21. Dial: 888-684-8852 or 215-446-0155, access code: 9582710#. Security code (if asked): 8115. Mailed notice(maf)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION by Defendants The Standard Fire Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company for extension of time to file answer regarding notice of removal, #1 Unopposed (Orlando, Thomas)
November 12, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (nsf, )
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 MAILED notice of removal letter to counsel of record. (nsf, )
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants The Sandard Fire Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company by Thomas Berthold Orlando (Orlando, Thomas)
November 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2021L065089) filed by The Sandard Fire Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18857077. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Orlando, Thomas)
November 9, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mxo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kallemeyn Collision Center, Inc. et al v. The Standard Fire Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kallemeyn Collision Center, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Justin McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Kallemeyn
Represented By: Patrick Justin McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Berthold Orlando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Thomas Berthold Orlando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?