Nazirov v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Kodirjon Nazirov
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Ur Mendoza Jaddou and Connie Nolan
Case Number: 1:2021cv06033
Filed: November 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ronald A Guzman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kodirjon Nazirov as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou served on 11/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022; Connie Nolan served on 11/29/2021, answer due 1/28/2022; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 11/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS Receipts)(Hacking, James)
December 6, 2021 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Elizabeth Inez Treacy as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Connie Nolan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Treacy, Elizabeth)
December 6, 2021 Filing 4 DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Connie Nolan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Oswald, Craig)
November 15, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Connie Nolan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (ak, )
November 12, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ng, )
November 12, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, )
November 11, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kodirjon Nazirov by James Oliver Hacking, III (Hacking, James)
November 11, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hacking, James)
November 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kodirjon Nazirov; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18863324.(Hacking, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nazirov v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kodirjon Nazirov
Represented By: James Oliver Hacking, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Nolan
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?