Ervin v. Ervin et al
Plaintiff: Sarina Antonina Ervin
Respondent: Gwendolyn N Barlow and Raymond N Ervin
Case Number: 1:2021cv06064
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Filing 31 Exhibit List by Gwendolyn N Barlow, Raymond N Ervin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit Court Order, #3 Exhibit 21-1011 Appellate Brief, #4 Exhibit Email of Petitioner TCF Subpoena, #5 Exhibit Lake County Court Documents, #6 Exhibit Court Order, #7 Affidavit, #8 Exhibit Petitioner Citation to SSA, #9 Exhibit Court Transcript)(Barlow, Gwendolyn)
January 5, 2022 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM by Sarina Antonina Ervin in Support of Her Request for Costs and Fees (Elster, Matthew)
January 3, 2022 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to remove restricted filer status #22 is denied without prejudice to renewal before the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 29, 2021 Filing 28 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #20 ; USCA Case No. 21-3386. (rc, )
December 29, 2021 Filing 27 REFUND PROCESSED re REQUEST for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of $505, receipt no. 0752-19001752, regarding 505.00 fee payment of notice of appeal 19 (Barlow, Gwendolyn) #23 (td, )
December 28, 2021 Filing 26 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal, #20 . Notified counsel. (jh, )
December 28, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal, #20 . (jh, )
December 28, 2021 Filing 24 RESPONSE by Sarina Antonina Ervinin Opposition to MOTION by Respondents Gwendolyn N Barlow, Raymond N ErvinRemove Restricted Filer Status #22 (Elster, Matthew)
December 28, 2021 Filing 23 REQUEST for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of $505, receipt no. 0752-19001752, regarding 505.00 fee payment of notice of appeal 19 (Barlow, Gwendolyn)
December 28, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION by Respondents Gwendolyn N Barlow, Raymond N ErvinRemove Restricted Filer Status (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Payment of Atty Fees)(Barlow, Gwendolyn)
December 28, 2021 Filing 21 DOCKETING Statement by Gwendolyn N Barlow, Raymond N Ervin regarding notice of appeal, #20 (Barlow, Gwendolyn)
December 27, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of appeal by Gwendolyn N Barlow, Raymond N Ervin regarding orders #5 , #17 , #3 , #11 , #1 , #14 , #9 , #6 , #16 , #4 , #18 , #8 , #12 , #2 , #10 , #15 , #7 , #13 Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0752-19001760. Receipt number: n (Attachments: #1 Supplement Docketing Statement, #2 Exhibit Court Order 12/16/21, #3 Exhibit Court Order 12/20/21)(Barlow, Gwendolyn)
December 27, 2021 Filing 19 PAYMENT by Gwendolyn N Barlow, Raymond N Ervin of Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0752-19001752. (Barlow, Gwendolyn)
December 20, 2021 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Respondent and Third-Party Respondent's motion to reopen #16 is denied. The motion provides no valid grounds for questioning the correctness of the 12/16/2021 order #15 . (ca, )
December 17, 2021 Filing 17 REMAND with certified copy of order dated 12/16/2021 and letter to Circuit Court of Cook County via email. (rc, )
December 17, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION by Respondents Gwendolyn N Barlow, Raymond N Ervin to reopen case (Barlow, Gwendolyn)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 12/16/2021. Petitioner's motion to remand #6 is granted. This matter is remanded to the Circuit Court of the Nineteenth Judicial Circuit, Lake County, Illinois. The Clerk is directed to effectuate the remand forthwith. Petitioner's request for fees and costs under 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) is granted. By 1/6/2022, Petitioner shall file a memorandum, with evidentiary support, setting forth the fees and costs she incurred in seeking remand. Respondent and Third-Party Respondent shall respond to Petitioner's memorandum by 1/20/2022; Petitioner shall reply by 1/27/2022. The 12/17/2021 status hearing #14 is stricken. A hearing on the amount of the 1447(c) award is set for 2/8/2022 at 9:30 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Civil case remanded.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
December 6, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion to remand #6 is taken under advisement. Status hearing set for 12/17/2021 at 9:15 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the 12/17/2021 hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 3, 2021 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Motion hearing set for 12/6/2021 at 9:15 a.m. #8 is re-set for 9:00 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 2, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY by Sarina Antonina Ervin to response in opposition to motion,,, #11 for Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Feb. 2020 State Appellate Court Order, #2 Exhibit B - June 2007 State Court Order)(Elster, Matthew)
November 29, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE by Gwendolyn N Barlow, Raymond N Ervinin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Sarina Antonina Ervin to remand #6 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pattern of Disparate Treatment, #2 Exhibit Order of Protection, #3 Exhibit Court Order, #4 Exhibit Court Order, #5 Affidavit Affidavit of Fees, #6 Exhibit Court Order, #7 Exhibit Bystander Report, #8 Exhibit Court Order, #9 Exhibit Court Order, #10 Exhibit Transcript, #11 Exhibit Transcript, #12 Exhibit Transcript, #13 Exhibit Transcript, #14 Exhibit Transcript, #15 Exhibit Transcript, #16 Exhibit Transcript, #17 Exhibit FOIA Response, #18 Exhibit Motion for a Protective Order, #19 Affidavit Boldt Affidavit, #20 Exhibit Supreme Court Order, #21 Exhibit Procedural History, #22 Exhibit Transcript, #23 Exhibit Transcript)(Barlow, Gwendolyn)
November 23, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman. The Clerk is directed to re-style the caption to indicate that Sarina Ervin is Petitioner, Raymond Ervin is Respondent, and Gwendolyn Barlow is Third-Party Respondent. Respondents' motion for extension of time to file response to Petitioner's motion to remand #9 is granted in part and denied in part. The deadline for Respondent Raymond Ervin and Third-Party Respondent Gwendolyn Barlow to respond to the motion to remand is extended to 11/29/2021; Petitioner shall reply by 12/3/2021 at 4:00 pm Central Time. Mailed notice (lk, )
November 22, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION by Respondent Gwendolyn N Barlow for extension of time to file response/reply as to attorney appearance #5 , motion to remand #6 , attorney appearance #3 , attorney appearance #4 , order on motion to remand,,,, set/reset hearings,,, #8 , civil cover sheet #2 , notice of removal,,,,,,,,, #1 , memorandum in support of motion,, #7 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email notice to Petitioner's Counsel)(Barlow, Gwendolyn)
November 16, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to remand #6 is entered and continued. Gwendolyn Barlow and Raymond Ervin shall respond to the motion by 11/23/2021; Plaintiff shall reply by 11/30/2021. Motion hearing set for 12/6/2021 at 9:15 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
November 16, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM by Sarina Antonina Ervin in support of motion to remand #6 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - June 25, 2021 Ruling, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - November 17, 2020 Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - July 30, 2021 Sanction order, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - June 21, 2021 state court order, #5 Exhibit Group Exhibit E - July 30, 2021 Orders, #6 Exhibit Group Exhibit F - September 10, 2021 state court orders, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - October 15, 2021 state court order, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - November 10, 2021 state court order)(Elster, Matthew)
November 16, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Sarina Antonina Ervin to remand (Elster, Matthew)
November 16, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sarina Antonina Ervin by Matthew David Elster (Elster, Matthew)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Raymond N Ervin by Gwendolyn Marie Barlow BY RAYMOND ERVIN (Barlow, Gwendolyn)
November 15, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Gwendolyn N Barlow by Gwendolyn Marie Barlow (Barlow, Gwendolyn)
November 15, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Barlow, Gwendolyn)
November 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court of Lake County, case number (04D1943) Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18872904. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Court Order, #2 Exhibit Court Order, #3 Exhibit Court Order, #4 Exhibit Court Order, #5 Exhibit Court Order, #6 Exhibit Court Order, #7 Exhibit Court Order, #8 Exhibit Court Order, #9 Exhibit Court Order, #10 Exhibit Court Order, #11 Exhibit Motion, #12 Exhibit Court Order, #13 Exhibit Petition, #14 Exhibit Petition, #15 Exhibit Court Order, #16 Exhibit Court Order, #17 Exhibit Court Order, #18 Exhibit Court Order (Ex A and Ex B), #19 Exhibit Court Order (Ex A and Ex B), #20 Exhibit Court Order, #21 Exhibit Court Order, #22 Exhibit Court Order, #23 Exhibit Citation, #24 Exhibit Citation, #25 Exhibit Citation, #26 Exhibit Citation, #27 Exhibit Transcript, #28 Exhibit Transcript, #29 Exhibit Transcript, #30 Exhibit Transcript, #31 Exhibit Transcript, #32 Exhibit Transcript, #33 Exhibit Transcript, #34 Exhibit Transcript, #35 Exhibit Transcript, #36 Exhibit Transcript, #37 Exhibit Transcript, #38 Exhibit Transcript, #39 Exhibit Transcript, #40 Exhibit Body Attachment, #41 Exhibit Termination of IWO, #42 Exhibit IL HFS Communication, #43 Exhibit Body Attachment, #44 Exhibit Petition to Intervene, #45 Exhibit Motion for Affidavit of Fees, #46 Exhibit Motion for Leave to Respond to Affidavit of Fees, #47 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss Memorandum of Law, #48 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss or Stay all Rulings, #49 Exhibit Motion to Quash Subpoena TCF, #50 Exhibit Motion to Quash Subpoena USAA, #51 Exhibit Motion to Reconsider, #52 Exhibit Motion to Reconsider, #53 Exhibit Motion to Strike, #54 Exhibit Reply to Response, #55 Exhibit Reply to S Ervin Response, #56 Exhibit Response from IDHFS, #57 Exhibit Response to Motion to Vacate, #58 Exhibit Response to Pet Affidavit of Fees, #59 Exhibit Response to Verified Petition, #60 Exhibit Response to Verified Petition, #61 Exhibit Body Attachment, #62 Exhibit S Ervin Assignment, #63 Exhibit Stop Garnishment Letter from SSA, #64 Exhibit Letter to J Steele from SSA, #65 Exhibit Receipt of Court Order)(Barlow, Gwendolyn)
November 15, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, )
November 15, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (dxb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ervin v. Ervin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarina Antonina Ervin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gwendolyn N Barlow
Represented By: Gwendolyn Marie Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Raymond N Ervin
Represented By: Gwendolyn Marie Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?