Masad Food Industry v. INTERNATIONAL GOLDEN FOODS, INC.
Plaintiff: Masad Food Industry
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL GOLDEN FOODS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2021cv06075
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Defendant's motion for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead #5 is granted. Defendant to file answer or otherwise plead by 1/14/22. Joint initial status report remains due on 1/26/22. #3 Mailed notice. (dm, )
December 10, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION by Defendant International Golden Foods, Inc. for extension of time to file answer or Otherwise Plead (Nabhani, Peter)
December 10, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant International Golden Foods, Inc. by Peter Carl Nabhani (Nabhani, Peter)
December 1, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On or before 1/26/22, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Mailed notice. (dm, )
November 30, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Masad Food Industry as to International Golden Foods, Inc. on 11/19/2021, answer due 12/10/2021. (Sweis, David)
November 15, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, )
November 15, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ng, )
November 15, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant INTERNATIONAL GOLDEN FOODS, INC. (ak, )
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Masad Food Industry; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18868906. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sweis, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Masad Food Industry v. INTERNATIONAL GOLDEN FOODS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Masad Food Industry
Represented By: David R. Sweis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL GOLDEN FOODS, INC.
Represented By: Peter Carl Nabhani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?