Britt v. The University of Chicago Medical Center
Plaintiff: Sherlene Britt
Defendant: The University of Chicago Medical Center
Case Number: 1:2021cv06167
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Franklin U Valderrama
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: For the reasons stated in the motion, the Court grants Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. #6 The deadline for Defendant University of Chicago Medical Center to file an answer or other response to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 01/29/2022. Mailed notice (axc).
December 21, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION by Defendant The University of Chicago Medical Center for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Warner, Michael)
December 21, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The University of Chicago Medical Center by Michael A. Warner, Jr (Warner, Michael)
November 30, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sherlene Britt as to The University of Chicago Medical Center on 11/29/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (Handler, Joel)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 02/01/2022, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report. Plaintiff must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. If the defendant(s) has not been served with process by that date, plaintiff's counsel is instructed to file an individual status report indicating the status of service of process by the same deadline. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Any nongovernmental corporate party that qualifies under the Rules is reminded of the requirement to file a disclosure statement under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1/N.D. Ill. Local Rule 3.2. Mailed notice (axc).
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sherlene Britt by Joel F. Handler (Handler, Joel)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Sherlene Britt; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18887458. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Handler, Joel)
November 18, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The University of Chicago Medical Center (mxo, )
November 18, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mxo, )
November 18, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (mxo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Britt v. The University of Chicago Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherlene Britt
Represented By: Joel F. Handler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The University of Chicago Medical Center
Represented By: Michael A. Warner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?