Waystar, Inc. et al v. Weinberg
Plaintiff: Waystar, Inc., Derby TopCo Partnership LP, Derby TopCo, Inc. and Derby GP, LLC
Defendant: Tracey Weinberg
Case Number: 1:2021cv06172
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joan B Gottschall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Pursuant to plaintiffs' notice of voluntary dismissal (No. #10 ), this action is dismissed without prejudice. As plaintiffs request, exhibits A-C to the complaint (No. #7 ) shall remain sealed because plaintiffs have withdrawn those exhibits from the court's consideration, and they will not be used as a basis for any judicial decision in this case. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (mjc, )
December 1, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Zielinski, Sarah)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 11/22/2021. Mailed notice(vcf, )
November 22, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Enter order denying without prejudice plaintiffs' motion (No. #6 ) to seal exhibits A-C to the complaint and dismissing plaintiffs' complaint (No. #1 ) for failure to establish this court's subject matter jurisdiction. In accordance with the order, exhibits A-C (No. #7 ) will remain sealed pending further order of court. Plaintiffs have until and including 12/1/2021 to file an amended complaint and renew their motion to seal. Mailed notice (vcf, )
November 18, 2021 Filing 7 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Derby GP, LLC, Derby TopCo Partnership LP, Derby TopCo, Inc., Waystar, Inc. regarding MOTION by Plaintiffs Derby GP, LLC, Derby TopCo Partnership LP, Derby TopCo, Inc., Waystar, Inc. to seal Exhibits A-C to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Declaratory Judgment #6 (Zielinski, Sarah)
November 18, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiffs Derby GP, LLC, Derby TopCo Partnership LP, Derby TopCo, Inc., Waystar, Inc. to seal Exhibits A-C to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Declaratory Judgment (Zielinski, Sarah)
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs re complaint, #1 (Zielinski, Sarah)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Derby GP, LLC, Derby TopCo Partnership LP, Derby TopCo, Inc., Waystar, Inc. by Amy L. Starinieri Gilbert (Gilbert, Amy)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Derby GP, LLC, Derby TopCo Partnership LP, Derby TopCo, Inc., Waystar, Inc. by Sarah Ann Zielinski (Zielinski, Sarah)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Zielinski, Sarah)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment filed by Waystar, Inc., Derby GP, LLC, Derby TopCo, Inc., Derby TopCo Partnership LP; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18888242. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit B - Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit C - Filed Under Seal)(Zielinski, Sarah)
November 18, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (sxh, )
November 18, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (sxh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waystar, Inc. et al v. Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waystar, Inc.
Represented By: Amy L. Starinieri Gilbert
Represented By: Sarah Ann Zielinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derby TopCo Partnership LP
Represented By: Amy L. Starinieri Gilbert
Represented By: Sarah Ann Zielinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derby TopCo, Inc.
Represented By: Amy L. Starinieri Gilbert
Represented By: Sarah Ann Zielinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derby GP, LLC
Represented By: Amy L. Starinieri Gilbert
Represented By: Sarah Ann Zielinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracey Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?