In re Unterseher
In Re: Kyle Unterseher and Claire Unterseher
Case Number: 1:2021cv06179
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2022 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE Supplemental Certificate of Service (Jordan, Kenderick)
January 10, 2022 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Service NOTICE OF FILING OF ACTION FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY (Jordan, Kenderick)
January 10, 2022 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic status hearing set for 3/8/2022 at 9:15 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (dal, )
January 8, 2022 Filing 14 Form LR65.1 Irrevocable Standby Letter of Credit by Claire Unterseher, Kyle Unterseher (Jordan, Kenderick)
December 23, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY AND MONITION Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 12/23/2021. Mailed notice (dal, )
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER APPROVING AD INTERIM STIPULATION; APPROVING IRREVOCABLE STANDBY LETTER OF CREDIT; APPROVING STIPULATION OF COSTS; DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE OF COMPLAINT AND MONITION; AND ORDERING INJUNCTIVE RELIEF RESTRAINING PROSECUTION OF CLAIMS Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 12/23/2021: Mailed notice (dal, )
December 23, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Plaintiffs' motion for entry of order approving ad interim stipulation; approving irrevocable standby letter of credit; approving stipulation of costs; directing issuance of notice of complaint and monition; and ordering injunctive relief restraining prosecution of claims #7 is granted. Enter orders. Mailed notice (dal, )
November 19, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Claire Unterseher, Kyle Unterseher by Kenderick Mason Jordan (Jordan, Kenderick)
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION Ad Interim Stipulation for Value (Friedman, Shari)
November 18, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM motion for order #7 by Claire Unterseher, Kyle Unterseher Memorandum of Law Support of Motion for Orders (Friedman, Shari)
November 18, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION by In Re Claire Unterseher, Kyle Unterseher for order Motion for Entry of Orders (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Friedman, Shari)
November 18, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Value (Friedman, Shari)
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Costs (Friedman, Shari)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION Ad Interim Stipulation for Value (Friedman, Shari)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for In Re Claire Unterseher, Kyle Unterseher by Shari L. Friedman (Friedman, Shari)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Friedman, Shari)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kyle Unterseher, Claire Unterseher; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18888625. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit exhibit A)(Friedman, Shari)
November 18, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (mxo, )
November 18, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mxo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Unterseher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Kyle Unterseher
Represented By: Shari L. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Claire Unterseher
Represented By: Shari L. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?