Wilson v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Carli J. Wilson
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv06183
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T Gilbert
Referring Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2022 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.4, the Court enters the following briefing schedule for dispositive motions: Plaintiff shall file her dispositive brief on or before 3/14/22. Defendant shall file her dispositive brief on or before 4/28/22. Plaintiff's reply shall be filed on or before 5/12/22. Mailed notice (ber, )
January 12, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFIED COPY OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Souza, Abraham)
December 16, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert:This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gilbert. A briefing schedule will be set after the Administrative Record is filed. Mailed notice (ber, )
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 12/9/21. (nsf, )
December 7, 2021 Filing 6 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Marvin, Cody)
November 26, 2021 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Abraham Judson Souza as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Souza, Abraham)
November 22, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Parties are directed to submit a written joint status report by 01/22/2022. Mailed notice. (rbf, )
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Carli J. Wilson by Cody Thomas Marvin (Marvin, Cody)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Marvin, Cody)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Carli J. Wilson; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18889333. (Attachments: #1 AC decision)(Marvin, Cody)
November 18, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mxo, )
November 18, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (mxo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carli J. Wilson
Represented By: Cody Thomas Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Abraham Judson Souza
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?