International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division et al v. National Railroad Passsenger Corp.
Plaintiff: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division, SMART-TD GENERAL COMMITTEE OF ADJUSTMENT GO-342, SMART-TD GENERAL COMMITTEE OF ADJUSTMENT GO-663 and SMART-TD GENERAL COMMITTEE OF ADJUSTMENT GO-769
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) and National Railroad Passsenger Corp.
Case Number: 1:2021cv06282
Filed: November 23, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Referring Judge: Franklin U Valderrama
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: The Parties' joint motion to hold Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction in abeyance, filed in related case no. 21-cv-6281 #14 is granted in part. The Parties inform the Court that, as of 12/14/2021, Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a Amtrak (Amtrak) has suspended its requirement that all employees be vaccinated against COVID-19. R. [14-1] para. 1. As such, the Parties agree that the pending motion for preliminary injunction #10 in this case, as well as the pending motion for preliminary injunction in related case no. 21-cv-6282 R. 12, be held in abeyance unless or until Amtrak reinstates its mandatory vaccination policy. R. [14-1] para. 2. Accordingly, the Court denies Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction #10 without prejudice, with leave to refile if Amtrak reinstates its mandatory vaccination policy. Docket no. #11 is terminated as a motion. Mailed notice (axc).
December 16, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE by National Railroad Passsenger Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Joint Motion for the Court to Hold Plaintiffs' Motions for Preliminary Injunction in Abeyance)(Woo, Samantha)
December 15, 2021 Filing 15 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/15/21.(aee, )
December 13, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by National Railroad Passsenger Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Unopposed Motion for Excess Pages)(Woo, Samantha)
December 9, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by National Railroad Passsenger Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Joint Motion for Reassignment)(Woo, Samantha)
December 8, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiffs International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division, SMART-TD GENERAL COMMITTEE OF ADJUSTMENT GO-342, SMART-TD GENERAL COMMITTEE OF ADJUSTMENT GO-769, SMART-TD GENERAL COMMITTEE OF ADJUSTMENT GO-663 for preliminary injunction Memorandum in Support (Diehl-Gibbons, Erika)
December 8, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiffs International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division, SMART-TD GENERAL COMMITTEE OF ADJUSTMENT GO-342, SMART-TD GENERAL COMMITTEE OF ADJUSTMENT GO-769, SMART-TD GENERAL COMMITTEE OF ADJUSTMENT GO-663 for preliminary injunction (Diehl-Gibbons, Erika)
December 3, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by National Railroad Passsenger Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Joint Motion for Reassignment)(Woo, Samantha)
December 3, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant National Railroad Passsenger Corp. (jf, )
November 30, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division, SMART-TD GENERAL COMMITTEE OF ADJUSTMENT GO-342, SMART-TD GENERAL COMMITTEE OF ADJUSTMENT GO-769, SMART-TD GENERAL COMMITTEE OF ADJUSTMENT GO-663 by Shawn Mckinley (Mckinley, Shawn)
November 30, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division, SMART-TD GENERAL COMMITTEE OF ADJUSTMENT GO-342, SMART-TD GENERAL COMMITTEE OF ADJUSTMENT GO-769, SMART-TD GENERAL COMMITTEE OF ADJUSTMENT GO-663 by Kevin C. Brodar (Brodar, Kevin)
November 30, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division, SMART-TD GENERAL COMMITTEE OF ADJUSTMENT GO-342, SMART-TD GENERAL COMMITTEE OF ADJUSTMENT GO-769, SMART-TD GENERAL COMMITTEE OF ADJUSTMENT GO-663 by Erika A Diehl-Gibbons (Diehl-Gibbons, Erika)
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant National Railroad Passsenger Corp. by Donald J. Munro (Munro, Donald)
November 29, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant National Railroad Passsenger Corp. by James M Burnham (Burnham, James)
November 29, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant National Railroad Passsenger Corp. by Samantha Woo (Woo, Samantha)
November 29, 2021 Filing 2 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling conference set for 2/2/2022 at 09:45 AM (to track the case only; no appearances required). Joint Rule 26(f) planning report due 1/24/2022. The court will enter an order based on the report. Mailed notice (reg)
November 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by SMART-TD GENERAL COMMITTEE OF ADJUSTMENT GO-769, International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division, SMART-TD GENERAL COMMITTEE OF ADJUSTMENT GO-663, SMART-TD GENERAL COMMITTEE OF ADJUSTMENT GO-342; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18902334. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Diehl-Gibbons, Erika)
November 23, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lxk, )
November 23, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lxk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division et al v. National Railroad Passsenger Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division
Represented By: Erika A Diehl-Gibbons
Represented By: Kevin C. Brodar
Represented By: Shawn Mckinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART-TD GENERAL COMMITTEE OF ADJUSTMENT GO-342
Represented By: Erika A Diehl-Gibbons
Represented By: Kevin C. Brodar
Represented By: Shawn Mckinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART-TD GENERAL COMMITTEE OF ADJUSTMENT GO-663
Represented By: Erika A Diehl-Gibbons
Represented By: Kevin C. Brodar
Represented By: Shawn Mckinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMART-TD GENERAL COMMITTEE OF ADJUSTMENT GO-769
Represented By: Erika A Diehl-Gibbons
Represented By: Kevin C. Brodar
Represented By: Shawn Mckinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passsenger Corp.
Represented By: Donald J. Munro
Represented By: James M Burnham
Represented By: Samantha Woo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?