Sun v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Jianmin Sun
Defendant: Rachel L. Johnson, Carrie D. Teager and Unknown Occupants
Case Number: 1:2021cv06462
Filed: December 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ronald A Guzman
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2021 MAILED CERTIFIED Copy of Remand Order dated 12/9/2021 to DuPage Court from the U.S. District Court # 21cv6462. DuPage Circuit court # 2021LM000894. (jh, )
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Because Defendant has not demonstrated that removal is proper, the Court directs the Clerk of Court to remand the case to the Circuit Court of DuPage County, Illinois forthwith. Defendant's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 12/9/2021. Mailed notice. (kp, )
December 3, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jh, )
December 2, 2021 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Defendant Carrie D. Teager for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (jh, )
December 2, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (jh, )
December 2, 2021 Filing 1 RECEIVED NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court, Eighteenth Judicial Circuit, Dupage, case number (2021LM000894) filed by Rachel L. Johnson, Carrie D. Teager and Unknown Occupants. (Exhibits) (jh, )
December 2, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey I. Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sun v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jianmin Sun
Represented By: Bernard K Weiler
Represented By: Brandan Rissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie D. Teager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Occupants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?