McNeal v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Katrina M. McNeal
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv06610
Filed: December 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John F Kness
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFIED COPY OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Cooney, Nigel)
December 14, 2021 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Nigel B Cooney as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Cooney, Nigel)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 12/13/2021: This matter is before the Court for review of a final decision by the Commissioner of Social Security. The parties should promptly consult with each other to determine (1) whether they will consent to the reassignment of this case to the magistrate judge for all further proceedings; and (2) whether they will agree to a voluntary remand to the Commissioner. If the parties consent to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge, they must file a joint statement of consent under Local Rule 73.1(a). If the parties agree to a voluntary remand to the Commissioner, they must file an agreed motion for remand. Otherwise, under Local Rule 16.4, Plaintiff's brief in support of reversing or remanding the Commissioner's decision shall be due within 60 days after the filing of the answer to the complaint and the administrative record. The Commissioner's motion to affirm and its brief in support shall be due within 45 days of the filing of Plaintiff's brief. Plaintiff's reply brief, if any, shall be due 14 days later. Status hearing set for 6/22/2022 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice(ef, )
December 10, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Katrina M. McNeal by Cody Thomas Marvin (Marvin, Cody)
December 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Marvin, Cody)
December 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Katrina M. McNeal; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18955923. (Attachments: #1 AC decision)(Marvin, Cody)
December 10, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Kness. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jmk, )
December 10, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jmk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeal v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina M. McNeal
Represented By: Cody Thomas Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Nigel B Cooney
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?