Merritt v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Jean Merritt
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv06640
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T Gilbert
Referring Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFIED COPY OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Kelly, Kathryn)
January 3, 2022 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gilbert. A briefing schedule will be set after the Administrative Record is filed. Mailed notice (ber, )
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Judge Charles R. Norgle, Sr no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Executive Committee on 12/22/21. (aee, )
December 16, 2021 Filing 5 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Kelly, Kathryn)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4 DESIGNATION of Kathryn Ann Kelly as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Kelly, Kathryn)
December 13, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jean Merritt by Neil H. Good (Good, Neil)
December 13, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Good, Neil)
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jean Merritt; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18962394.(Good, Neil)
December 13, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (sxh, )
December 13, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (sxh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merritt v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Merritt
Represented By: Neil H. Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Kelly
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?