Lee v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Wiliam Lee
Defendant: Dr. Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv06661
Filed: December 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Franklin U Valderrama
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFIED COPY OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Heffron, Scott)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Signed by the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama on 1/28/2022. Mailed notice (nsf, )
January 28, 2022 MAILED copy of order 1/28/22 to recruited counsel, the court's Systems Department, and the PACER system. (nsf, )
December 16, 2021 Filing 7 DESIGNATION of Scott Dennis Heffron as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Heffron, Scott)
December 14, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: Plaintiff's brief in support of reversing or remanding the decision subject to review is due within 60 days of the filing of the administrative record (no motion required). The Social Security Administration's motion to affirm the decision subject to review and its brief in support are due 45 days after plaintiff's brief is filed. Plaintiff's reply brief, if any, is due 14 days after defendant's brief is filed. No oversized briefs will be allowed without prior court approval obtained at least one week before the due date and upon good cause shown. Additionally, on or before the deadline for the filing of the administrative record, the parties shall file a joint status report in which they indicate (i) whether the parties will agree to consent to the exercise of jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge and (ii) whether they will agree to a voluntary remand to the Commissioner. If the parties consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge, they shall execute and file with the Court the joint consent form included as part of the Clerk's Notice previously filed in this case. If the parties agree to a voluntary remand to the Commissioner, they must file an agreed motion for remand. Mailed notice (axc).
December 14, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Wiliam Lee for attorney representation. (gcy, )
December 14, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Wiliam Lee for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and affidavit. (gcy, )
December 14, 2021 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Wiliam Lee. (gcy, )
December 14, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (gcy, )
December 14, 2021 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Wiliam Lee. (gcy, )
December 14, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gcy, )
December 14, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (gcy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wiliam Lee
Represented By: Stephen Henry Dabrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Represented By: Scott Dennis Heffron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?