Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company v. THE NEW DATING GAME, INC. et al
Plaintiff: Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: THE NEW DATING GAME, INC., MOZELL BARNES and KEISHA LeFLORE, as Administrator for the Estate of ALFONZO LeFLORE, Deceased
Case Number: 1:2021cv06702
Filed: December 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by KEISHA LeFLORE, as Administrator for the Estate of ALFONZO LeFLORE, Deceased(Robbins, Michael)
January 30, 2022 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: By no later than 2/15/2022, the parties (or, if no defendant has yet appeared, the plaintiff(s)) are to file a joint status report that includes the following information: (1) the status of service of process upon each defendant; (2) a description of each party's claims and defenses; (3) details regarding any discussions concerning settlement, whether before or after the filing of the lawsuit; (4) a proposed discovery and pretrial schedule; and (5) any other matters that any party wishes to bring to the Court's attention. The case is set for a case management conference under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 on 2/22/2022 at 9:35 a.m. The case management conference will be conducted by telephone, using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to any defendant that has not yet appeared by counsel via regular mail at the address at which the defendant has been or is to be served with process. (mk)
January 19, 2022 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants MOZELL BARNES, THE NEW DATING GAME, INC. by Linda C. Chatman (Chatman, Linda)
January 19, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by MOZELL BARNES, THE NEW DATING GAME, INC.(Chatman, Linda)
January 10, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company as to THE NEW DATING GAME, INC. on 12/30/2021, answer due 1/20/2022. (Nashban, Stephanie)
January 10, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company as to MOZELL BARNES on 12/30/2021, answer due 1/20/2022. (Nashban, Stephanie)
January 6, 2022 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Unopposed motion for extension of time #9 is granted; defendant LeFlore's response to complaint is to be filed by 2/7/2022. (mk)
January 5, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant KEISHA LeFLORE, as Administrator for the Estate of ALFONZO LeFLORE, Deceased for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 (Unopposed) (Robbins, Michael)
January 3, 2022 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant KEISHA LeFLORE, as Administrator for the Estate of ALFONZO LeFLORE, Deceased by Jeffrey J. Neslund (Neslund, Jeffrey)
January 3, 2022 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant KEISHA LeFLORE, as Administrator for the Estate of ALFONZO LeFLORE, Deceased by Michael David Robbins (Robbins, Michael)
December 27, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company as to KEISHA LeFLORE, as Administrator for the Estate of ALFONZO LeFLORE, Deceased on 12/17/2021, answer due 1/7/2022. (Nashban, Stephanie)
December 17, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company by Gary Lee Gassman (Gassman, Gary)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4 FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT STATEMENT by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company (Nashban, Stephanie)
December 16, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company by Stephanie Alix Nashban (Nashban, Stephanie)
December 16, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Nashban, Stephanie)
December 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT filed by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18975803. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Nashban, Stephanie)
December 16, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants MOZELL BARNES, KEISHA LeFLORE, THE NEW DATING GAME, INC. (sxh, )
December 16, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (sxh, )
December 16, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (sxh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company v. THE NEW DATING GAME, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephanie Alix Nashban
Represented By: Gary Lee Gassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE NEW DATING GAME, INC.
Represented By: Linda C. Chatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOZELL BARNES
Represented By: Linda C. Chatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEISHA LeFLORE, as Administrator for the Estate of ALFONZO LeFLORE, Deceased
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Neslund
Represented By: Michael David Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?