Viking Asset Fund v. PMAT DDP, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Viking Asset Fund, LLC
Defendant: PMAT DDP, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2021cv06753
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2022 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Pursuant to rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure #6 filed on 1/27/2022, this action is dismissed without prejudice. Civil case terminated. Emailed notice (cdh, )
January 27, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Viking Asset Fund, LLC (Stein, Lawrence)
January 4, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Viking Asset Fund, LLC (Stein, Lawrence)
January 4, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant PMAT DDP, L.L.C. (cxr, )
December 21, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Viking Asset Fund, LLC by Lawrence A. Stein (Stein, Lawrence)
December 20, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Viking Asset Fund, LLC by Anthony M. DeLongis (DeLongis, Anthony)
December 20, 2021 Filing 2 Civil action cover sheet STATEMENT by Viking Asset Fund, LLC (Stein, Lawrence)
December 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Viking Asset Fund, LLC; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18984890. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Appearance)(Stein, Lawrence)
December 20, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (dxb, )
December 20, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viking Asset Fund v. PMAT DDP, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viking Asset Fund, LLC
Represented By: Anthony M. DeLongis
Represented By: Lawrence A. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMAT DDP, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?