Brown, III et al v. Ben Gordon Health Ctr. et al
Plaintiff: Leo D Brown, III and Latrice Foules
Defendant: Ben Gordon Health Ctr., Northwestern Medicine and Kishwaukee Hospital
Case Number: 1:2021cv06780
Filed: December 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Before the Court are the following: Plaintiff Latrice Foules's Motion for Attorney Representation and Application to Proceed in forma pauperis; and Plaintiff Leo Brown, III's Motion for Attorney Representation and Application to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Complaint alleges that on September 29, 2021, Mr. Brown presented to the Ben Gordon Center for treatment. The staff at Ben Gordon purportedly refused certain health care and transferred Mr. Brown to Jackson Park Hospital instead of Amita, where he had been accepted and was supposed to have a neuropsych evaluation. The Complaint states Mr. Brown is currently homeless, unable to complete schooling, and is now in a catatonic state. With respect to Ms. Foules, it is not apparent from the Complaint who Ms. Foules is, what her relationship to Mr. Brown is, or how she is an aggrieved party such that she has standing to pursue this matter. In fact, there is not a single mention of Ms. Foules in the Complaint, and the Complaint does not bear Ms. Foules' signature. Thus, Ms. Foule''s motions are denied and she is dismissed from this action without prejudice. As for Mr. Brown, neither the Complaint, nor Mr. Brown's Motion for Attorney Representation, nor his Application to Proceed in forma pauperis are signed by Mr. Brown. This alone warrants denial of the motions and dismissal of the Complaint. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 11(a) ("Every pleading, written motion, and other paper must be signed by at least one attorney of record in the attorney's name--or by a party personally if the party is unrepresented."). Mr. Brown is directed to re-file signed copies (signed by himself or an authorized legal representative) of his Complaint and motions by February 24, 2022. Failure to do so may result in summary dismissal of this case. It is so ordered. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 1/13/2022. Mailed notice(vcf, )
December 21, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (aee, )
December 21, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (aee, )
December 17, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Latrice Foules for attorney representation. (aee, )
December 17, 2021 Filing 5 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Leo D Brown, III for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (aee, )
December 17, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Latrice Foules for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (aee, )
December 17, 2021 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Latrice Foules. (aee, )
December 17, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (aee, )
December 17, 2021 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Leo D Brown, III, Latrice Foules. (aee, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown, III et al v. Ben Gordon Health Ctr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo D Brown, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latrice Foules
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Gordon Health Ctr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwestern Medicine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kishwaukee Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?