Bravo et al v Village of Melrose Park et al
Plaintiff: Fernando Bravo and Fernanda Bravo
Defendant: Village of Melrose Park Illinois, International Bank of Chicago, Carl Capra, Anthony Sabatino and Village of Melrose Park
Case Number: 1:2021cv06813
Filed: December 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Anthony Sabatino. Anthony Sabatino waiver sent on 12/22/2021, answer due 2/21/2022. (Grandfield, Cynthia)
February 4, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Carl Capra. Carl Capra waiver sent on 12/22/2021, answer due 2/21/2022. (Grandfield, Cynthia)
February 4, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Village of Melrose Park. Village of Melrose Park waiver sent on 12/22/2021, answer due 2/21/2022. (Grandfield, Cynthia)
February 3, 2022 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Carl Capra, Anthony Sabatino, Village of Melrose Park by Cynthia Sara Grandfield (Grandfield, Cynthia)
February 3, 2022 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Carl Capra, Anthony Sabatino, Village of Melrose Park by K. Austin Zimmer (Zimmer, K.)
January 27, 2022 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant International Bank of Chicago by Michael Lee Tinaglia of Law Offices of Michael Lee Tinaglia, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Tinaglia, Michael)
January 26, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Anthony Sabitino on 12/22/21 by Plaintiffs Fernanda Bravo, Fernando Bravo. Waiver of service due by 2/21/2022. (Michelotti, Joseph)
January 26, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Carl Capra on 12/22/21 by Plaintiffs Fernanda Bravo, Fernando Bravo. Waiver of service due by 2/21/2022. (Michelotti, Joseph)
January 26, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Village of Melrose Park on 12/22/21 by Plaintiffs Fernanda Bravo, Fernando Bravo. Waiver of service due by 2/21/2022. (Michelotti, Joseph)
January 25, 2022 Filing 2 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On or before 3/7/22, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Mailed notice. (dm, )
December 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Fernando Bravo, Fernanda Bravo; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18993321. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet)(Michelotti, Joseph)
December 22, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, )
December 22, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (cm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bravo et al v Village of Melrose Park et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Bravo
Represented By: Joseph C. Michelotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernanda Bravo
Represented By: Joseph C. Michelotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Melrose Park Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Bank of Chicago
Represented By: Michael Lee Tinaglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Capra
Represented By: K. Austin Zimmer
Represented By: Cynthia Sara Grandfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Sabatino
Represented By: K. Austin Zimmer
Represented By: Cynthia Sara Grandfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Melrose Park
Represented By: Cynthia Sara Grandfield
Represented By: K. Austin Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?