Patrick et al v. Golden Bear Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Tara Leigh Patrick, Denise Trlica, Masha Lund, Carmen Electra, Claudia Sampedro, Iesha Marie Crespo, Jessica Killings, Denise Milani, Paola Canas, Jessica Burciaga, Malu Lund and Brenda Geiger
Defendant: Golden Bear Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv06818
Filed: December 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2022 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's motion to dismiss #9 . Plaintiff is advised to review the Court's Standing Order on Motions to Dismiss, which is available on the Court's homepage at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Consistent with the purpose of the Federal Rules "to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, this Court's Standing Order requires Plaintiff to make an election as to whether Plaintiff will amend the complaint under Rule 15(a)(1), or stand on the current complaint and proceed with briefing on the motion to dismiss. To this end, Plaintiff shall file either: (1) an amended complaint within the time limit set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B) by 2/28/2022 or (2) a response to the motion to dismiss by 3/7/2022. If Plaintiff files a response, Defendant shall file a reply by 3/21/2022. If Plaintiff elects to amend its pleading in response to the motion to dismiss, then Defendant shall file within 21 days of the amended pleading either: (1) an answer; or (2) a revised motion to dismiss. Mailed notice (gel, )
February 7, 2022 Filing 8 STATUS Report (JOINT) by Jessica Killings, Masha Lund, Tara Leigh Patrick, Claudia Sampedro, Denise Trlica (Golaszewski, John)
February 7, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant Golden Bear Insurance Company to dismiss (Allen, Brandt)
February 7, 2022 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Golden Bear Insurance Company by Natasha Seaton (Seaton, Natasha)
February 7, 2022 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Golden Bear Insurance Company by Brandt William Allen (Allen, Brandt)
January 6, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Denise Trlica, Claudia Sampedro, Jessica Burciaga, Brenda Geiger, Paola Canas, Iesha Marie Crespo, Tara Leigh Patrick, Masha Lund, Jessica Killings as to Golden Bear Insurance Company on 1/3/2022, answer due 1/24/2022. (Golaszewski, John)
January 6, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Jessica Burciaga, Paola Canas, Iesha Marie Crespo, Brenda Geiger, Jessica Killings, Masha Lund, Tara Leigh Patrick, Claudia Sampedro, Denise Trlica by John Vincent Golaszewski (Golaszewski, John)
December 27, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Golden Bear Insurance Company. (ng, )
December 23, 2021 Filing 2 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. In addition, the parties must file a status report no later than 2/7/2022, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. During the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312) 818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. Mailed notice (gel, )
December 23, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jxj, )
December 23, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jj, )
December 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Denise Trlica, Claudia Sampedro, Jessica Burciaga, Brenda Geiger, Paola Canas, Iesha Marie Crespo, Tara Leigh Patrick, Masha Lund, Jessica Killings; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18993734. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Casas, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patrick et al v. Golden Bear Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Leigh Patrick
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Trlica
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Masha Lund
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Electra
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Sampedro
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iesha Marie Crespo
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Killings
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Milani
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paola Canas
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Burciaga
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malu Lund
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Geiger
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Bear Insurance Company
Represented By: Brandt William Allen
Represented By: Natasha Seaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?