Riley v. Dukane Precast
Plaintiff: Roger L Riley
Defendant: Dukane Precast
Case Number: 1:2021cv06858
Filed: December 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2022 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Roger L Riley by Heather Renee Adams Appearance for Plaintiff Roger L. Riley by Heather Renee Adams (Adams, Heather)
January 25, 2022 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Roger L Riley by Maureen Ann Maffei Apperance on Behalf of Maureen Maffei (Maffei, Maureen)
January 25, 2022 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Roger L Riley by Eric Louis Singer Appearance by Eric L. Singer (Singer, Eric)
January 25, 2022 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: The court recruits Eric Louis Singer of Ice Miller, LLP, 2300 Cabot Drive Suite 455, Lisle, 60532 IL, (630) 955-5826, to represent Plaintiff in accordance with counsel's trial bar obligation under N.D. Ill. Local Rule 83.11(g). Within 30 days, counsel should enter an appearance for Plaintiff and inform the court whether he intends to proceed with the current complaint or submit an amended one. Mailed notice (vcf, )
January 13, 2022 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 and motion for attorney representation #5 are granted. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint with the assistance of appointed counsel. Mailed notice (vcf, )
December 27, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (rp, )
December 22, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Roger L Riley for attorney representation (rp, )
December 22, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Roger L Riley for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (rp, )
December 22, 2021 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Roger L Riley (rp, )
December 22, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (rp, )
December 22, 2021 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Roger L Riley (rp, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/30/2021: #1 Exhibit) (rp, ).
December 22, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riley v. Dukane Precast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger L Riley
Represented By: Eric Louis Singer
Represented By: Heather Renee Adams
Represented By: Maureen Ann Maffei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dukane Precast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?