Harrington et al v. Von Baron Legal Team
Plaintiff: Matthew S. Harrington and Stephanie L. Harrington
Defendant: Von Baron Legal Team doing business as Retention Group
Case Number: 1:2021cv06887
Filed: December 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joan B Gottschall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Filing 9 TRANSFERRED the case record to the Western Division 22cv50007. (jp, )
January 7, 2022 Filing 8 DIVISIONAL TRANSFER Notice. Case transferred to Western Division - Rockford. Pursuant to transfer order: #7 . (jh, )
January 6, 2022 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: No objection having been filed by the deadline (No. #5 ) of 1/4/2022, this case is transferred to the Western Division of this court under 28 U.S.C. 1404(b). Mailed notice (mjc, )
January 6, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew S. Harrington, Stephanie L. Harrington as to Von Baron Legal Team on 1/4/2022, answer due 1/25/2022. (Volheim, Nathan)
December 29, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: It appears from the civil cover sheet and the complaint that a substantial portion of the events giving rise to this case occurred in plaintiffs' county of residence, DeKalb County. DeKalb County falls within the Western Division. See 28 U.S.C. 93(a)(2). "It is well established that a district court has the authority to sua sponte transfer a case under 28 U.S.C. 1404." In re Ryze Claims Sols., LLC, 968 F.3d 701, 706 & n.5 (7th Cir. 2020). The court intends to transfer this case to the Western Division under 28 U.S.C. 1404(b). Any objection to the transfer is due on or before 1/4/2022. Mailed notice (mjc, )
December 29, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Von Baron Legal Team. (lxk, )
December 28, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Matthew S. Harrington, Stephanie L. Harrington by Alejandro Emmanuel Figueroa (Figueroa, Alejandro)
December 28, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Matthew S. Harrington, Stephanie L. Harrington by Eric Donald Coleman (Coleman, Eric)
December 28, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Matthew S. Harrington, Stephanie L. Harrington by Nathan Charles Volheim (Volheim, Nathan)
December 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Matthew S. Harrington, Stephanie L. Harrington; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19003705. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Volheim, Nathan)
December 28, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lw, )
December 28, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrington et al v. Von Baron Legal Team
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew S. Harrington
Represented By: Alejandro Emmanuel Figueroa
Represented By: Eric Donald Coleman
Represented By: Nathan Charles Volheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie L. Harrington
Represented By: Alejandro Emmanuel Figueroa
Represented By: Eric Donald Coleman
Represented By: Nathan Charles Volheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Von Baron Legal Team doing business as Retention Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?