Honiball v. Life Protect 24/7, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Honiball
Defendant: Life Protect 24/7, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv06928
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Telephone Consumer Protection Act (TCPA)
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2022 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Unopposed motion for extension of time to 3/30/22 for defendant to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint #8 is granted. Telephonic status conference set for 3/10/22 is re-set to 4/7/22 at 9:15 a.m. Dial: 888-684-8852 or 215-446-0155, access code: 9582710#. Joint status report shall be filed by 4/1/22. Mailed notice(maf)
February 24, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Michael Honiball for extension of time to respond to complaint, file joint report and for initial conference, Unopposed (Kaufman, Avi)
January 26, 2022 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Docket entry #6 is amended as follows: Motion for extension of time to 2/28/22 for defendant to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint #5 is granted. Telephonic status conference set for 2/23/22 is re-set to 3/10/22 at 9:15 a.m. Dial: 888-684-8852 or 215-446-0155, access code: 9582710#. Security code (if asked): 8115. Joint status report shall be filed by 3/2/22. Mailed notice(maf)
January 26, 2022 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Motion for extension of time to 2/28/21 for defendant to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint #5 is granted. Telephonic status conference set for 2/23/22 is re-set to 3/10/22 at 9:15 a.m. Dial: 888-684-8852 or 215-446-0155, access code: 9582710#. Security code (if asked): 8115. Joint status report shall be filed by 3/2/22. Mailed notice(maf)
January 26, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Michael Honiball for extension of time to file answer (Kaufman, Avi)
January 13, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Honiball by Avi Robert Kaufman (Kaufman, Avi)
January 12, 2022 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Michael Honiball regarding Summons and Complaint served on Mark Slaughter on January 6, 2022 (Shambee, Juneitha)
January 4, 2022 Filing 2 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Telephonic status conference is set for 2/23/22 at 9:30 a.m. Dial: 888-684-8852 or 215-446-0155, access code: 9582710#. Security code (if asked): 8115. Joint status report shall be filed by 2/16/22. Mailed notice(maf)
January 3, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Life Protect 24/7, Inc. (ng, )
December 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Michael Honiball; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19009147. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shambee, Juneitha)
December 30, 2021 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey I. Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lxk, )
December 30, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lxk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Honiball v. Life Protect 24/7, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Honiball
Represented By: Juneitha S. Shambee
Represented By: Avi Robert Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Protect 24/7, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?