Edelstein v. Computer Information Concepts, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jennifer Edelstein
Defendant: Computer Information Concepts, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv06930
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 754 Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2022 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At the request of plaintiff's counsel, the telephonic status hearing set for 3/3/2022 is vacated and reset to 3/4/2022 at 9:20 a.m. The following call-in number will be used for the hearing: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Mailed notice. (mma, )
February 23, 2022 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court has reviewed the parties' joint status report and resets the initial status hearing from 3/1/2022 to 3/3/2022 at 9:20 a.m., by telephone using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. This will allow the Court to address the anticipated motion to dismiss, which defendant says it will file on 3/1/2022. The Court will set the discovery and pretrial schedule at that time. (mk)
February 22, 2022 Filing 9 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Jennifer Edelstein (Bramwell, Fitzgerald)
February 14, 2022 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Computer Information Concepts, Inc. by Christina C Brunty (Brunty, Christina)
February 14, 2022 Filing 7 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Computer Information Concepts, Inc. (Chico, Melanie)
February 14, 2022 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Computer Information Concepts, Inc. by Melanie Jeanne Chico (Chico, Melanie)
January 30, 2022 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: By no later than 2/22/2022, the parties (or, if no defendant has yet appeared, the plaintiff(s)) are to file a joint status report that includes the following information: (1) the status of service of process upon each defendant; (2) a description of each party's claims and defenses; (3) details regarding any discussions concerning settlement, whether before or after the filing of the lawsuit; (4) a proposed discovery and pretrial schedule; and (5) any other matters that any party wishes to bring to the Court's attention. The case is set for a case management conference under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 on 3/1/2022 at 9:20 a.m. The case management conference will be conducted by telephone, using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to any defendant that has not yet appeared by counsel via regular mail at the address at which the defendant has been or is to be served with process. (mk)
January 13, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jennifer Edelstein. Computer Information Concepts, Inc. waiver sent on 12/31/2021, answer due 3/1/2022. (Bramwell, Fitzgerald)
January 3, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jxj, )
January 3, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jj, )
December 30, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jennifer Edelstein by Fitzgerald Timothy Bramwell (Bramwell, Fitzgerald)
December 30, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Bramwell, Fitzgerald)
December 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jennifer Edelstein; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19009233.(Bramwell, Fitzgerald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edelstein v. Computer Information Concepts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Edelstein
Represented By: Fitzgerald Timothy Bramwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Computer Information Concepts, Inc.
Represented By: Melanie Jeanne Chico
Represented By: Christina C Brunty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?