Internet Media Interactive Corp. v. AbbVie Inc.
Plaintiff: Internet Media Interactive Corp.
Defendant: AbbVie Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00101
Filed: January 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2022 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), this case is dismissed with prejudice and with each party to bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees. Telephone status hearing set for 3/11/2022 is stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (ym, )
February 23, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Internet Media Interactive Corp. (Haller, Timothy)
January 20, 2022 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiff's first uncontested motion for extension of time #10 is granted. Responsive pleading to be filed on or before 3/2/2022. No appearance necessary on 1/25/2022. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 19, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Timothy J. Haller for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer,,, #10 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 1/25/2022 at 09:30 AM. (Haller, Timothy)
January 19, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff Internet Media Interactive Corp. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 , set/reset hearings,,,,, #7 , MOTION by Plaintiff Internet Media Interactive Corp. for extension of time First Uncontested Motion for Extension of Time (Haller, Timothy)
January 10, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Internet Media Interactive Corp. as to AbbVie Inc. on 1/10/2022, answer due 1/31/2022. (Haller, Timothy)
January 10, 2022 Filing 8 MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria, VA (bg, )
January 10, 2022 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Telephone status hearing is set for 3/11/2022 at 9:15 AM. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendant of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 7, 2022 Filing 6 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by Internet Media Interactive Corp. (Haller, Timothy)
January 7, 2022 Filing 5 Plaintiff's Local Rule 3.4 Notice of Claims Involving Patent by Internet Media Interactive Corp. (Haller, Timothy)
January 7, 2022 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Internet Media Interactive Corp. (Haller, Timothy)
January 7, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Internet Media Interactive Corp. by Timothy J. Haller (Haller, Timothy)
January 7, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Haller, Timothy)
January 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed by Internet Media Interactive Corp.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19032017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent 6,049,835)(Haller, Timothy)
January 7, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant AbbVie Inc. (cm, )
January 7, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, )
January 7, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Internet Media Interactive Corp. v. AbbVie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Internet Media Interactive Corp.
Represented By: Timothy J. Haller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?