Wepay Global Payments LLC v. Bank of America N. A.
Plaintiff: Wepay Global Payments LLC
Defendant: Bank of America N. A.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00105
Filed: January 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2022 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court grants the parties' motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #7 . Defendant's responsive pleading due by 3/30/2022. The Court grants the parties' motion for continuance #8 . The Court strikes the status date set for 3/8/2022 and resets it to 4/6/2022 at 9:30 a.m. The parties should file the initial joint status report by 3/31/2022. The Court reminds the parties that they should notice all motions for presentment. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
March 7, 2022 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Bank of America N. A. by James Terrence Hultquist (Hultquist, James)
March 1, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Wepay Global Payments LLC to continue Initial Case Management Conference (Wawrzyn, Matthew)
February 23, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Wepay Global Payments LLC for extension of time AGREED re Parties' Stipulation for 30-day Extension to Respond to Complaint (Wawrzyn, Matthew)
February 14, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Wepay Global Payments LLC regarding Complaint and Summons served on Ken Ladd, Manager authorized to accept service for Bank of America, N.A. on 2/08/2022 (Wawrzyn, Matthew)
February 8, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Bank of America N. A. (ey, )
January 10, 2022 Filing 5 MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: #1 (List of Patents, Exhibit A)) (ph, )
January 10, 2022 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 3/8/2022 at 9:30 AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 3/1/2022. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
January 7, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Wepay Global Payments LLC by Matthew Michael Wawrzyn (Wawrzyn, Matthew)
January 7, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Wawrzyn, Matthew)
January 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Wepay Global Payments LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19032255. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Design Patent, #2 Exhibit Claim Chart)(Wawrzyn, Matthew)
January 7, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (cm, )
January 7, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey I. Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wepay Global Payments LLC v. Bank of America N. A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wepay Global Payments LLC
Represented By: Matthew Michael Wawrzyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N. A.
Represented By: James Terrence Hultquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?