BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. Capitol Sales Company Inc.
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Defendant: Capitol Sales Company Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00132
Filed: January 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joan B Gottschall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BMO Harris Bank N.A. as to Capitol Sales Company Inc. on 2/1/2022, answer due 2/22/2022. (Moran, C. Douglas)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: An initial status report and, if appropriate, case management plan is due on or before March 23, 2022. In conformity with General Order 21-0027 and due to the need for social distancing during the COVID-19 pandemic, this court is ordering written status reports instead of routine oral status hearings. This includes initial status hearings and scheduling conferences under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). See Judge Gottschall's website for the procedure for requesting a hearing and for requirements for status reports and discovery plans during the COVID-19 pandemic. No Rule 26(f) discovery plan should be submitted until all defendants have been served. If all defendants have not been served by the deadline for filing an initial status report, the report should so state and propose a deadline for filing a discovery plan. The parties are directed to discuss settlement and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. They are further directed to meet and confer regarding a proposed discovery plan. See Judge Gottschall's civil case management packet regarding pretrial case management procedures at: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 1/18/2022. Mailed notice(mjc, )
January 14, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED complaint by BMO Harris Bank N.A. against Capitol Sales Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - W)(Moran, C. Douglas)
January 11, 2022 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: For purposes of federal court diversity jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332 and 1348, a national bank "is a citizen of the State in which its main office, as set forth in its articles of association, is located." Wachovia Bank v. Schmidt, 546 U.S. 303, 307 (2006). Plaintiff pleads its principal place of business in Chicago in its complaint, but does not indicate that this is the location of its main office as designated in its articles of association. Should there be a discrepancy between its principal place of business and its main office as designated in its articles of association, plaintiff may amend its complaint within the next 14 days. Otherwise, it need do nothing. Mailed notice (mjc, )
January 11, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Capitol Sales Company, Inc. (lxk, )
January 10, 2022 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by BMO Harris Bank N.A. (Carlson, Kurt)
January 10, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff BMO Harris Bank N.A. by C. Douglas Moran (Moran, C. Douglas)
January 10, 2022 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff BMO Harris Bank N.A. by Kurt M. Carlson (Carlson, Kurt)
January 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19038436. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A - November 30, 2011 Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit B - November 30, 2011 Business Loan Agreement, #4 Exhibit C - November 30, 2012 Renewal Promissory Note, #5 Exhibit D - November 30, 2012 Letter Amendment No. 1, #6 Exhibit E - November 26, 2013 Renewal Promissory Note, #7 Exhibit F - November 26, 2013 Letter Amendment No. 2, #8 Exhibit G - November 19, 2014 Renewal Promissory Note, #9 Exhibit H - November 19, 2014 Letter Amendment No. 3, #10 Exhibit I - November 18, 2015 Renewal Promissory Note, #11 Exhibit J - November 18, 2015 Letter Amendment No. 4, #12 Exhibit K - November 29, 2016 Renewal Promissory Note, #13 Exhibit L - November 29, 2016 Letter Amendment No. 5, #14 Exhibit M - November 30, 217 Renewal Promissory Note, #15 Exhibit N - November 30, 2017 Letter Amendment No. 6, #16 Exhibit O - November 30, 2018 Promissory Note, #17 Exhibit P - November 30, 2018 Commercial Security Agreement, #18 Exhibit Q - November 30, 2018 Promissory Note, #19 Exhibit R - December 11, 2019 Promissory, #20 Exhibit S - December 11, 2019 First Amendment to Business Loan Agreement, #21 Exhibit T - May 8, 2020 Promissory Note, #22 Exhibit U - September 8, 2020 Promissory Note, #23 Exhibit V - April 12, 2021 Loan Modification Agreement, #24 Exhibit W - December 7, 2018 Credit Card Agreement, #25 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carlson, Kurt)
January 10, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jxj, )
January 10, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jxj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. Capitol Sales Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Represented By: C. Douglas Moran
Represented By: Kurt M. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitol Sales Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?