Dampier v. Dart et al
Plaintiff: Marian Dampier
Defendant: Thomas Dart and Cook County Dept of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2022cv00139
Filed: January 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2022 Filing 6 LETTER from Marian Dampier dated 2/20/2022. (Envelope postmarked 2/22/2022) (lma, )
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied. To proceed with this action, Plaintiff must prepay the full $402 statutory filing fee. If he does not comply by March 18, 2022, this case will be summarily dismissed. The court defers consideration of Plaintiff's complaint and motion for attorney representation until his fee status has been resolved. Plaintiff must also promptly update his address if he is released or transferred to another facility. If he does not comply, this case may be subject to dismissal. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 2/11/2022. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 10, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Marian Dampier for attorney representation (kl, )
January 10, 2022 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Marian Dampier for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Attachments) (kl, )
January 10, 2022 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (kl, )
January 10, 2022 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Marian Dampier (Envelope not postmarked) (kl, )
January 10, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kl, )
January 10, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (kl, )
January 10, 2022 MAILED copy of the Clerk's Notice entry along with the Joint Consent Form to Marian Dampier (kl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dampier v. Dart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian Dampier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Dart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County Dept of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?