Miterin v. Global Payment Check Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Aleksandr Miterin
Defendant: Global Payment Check Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00241
Filed: January 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2022 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant's second agreed motion for extension of time to file answer #11 is granted and any answer shall be filed on or before 3/17/2022. Motion hearing set for 3/15/2022 is stricken. Mailed notice (gel, )
March 9, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Joseph D Kern for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #11 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 3/15/2022 at 11:00 AM. (Kern, Joseph)
March 9, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Global Payment Check Services, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Second Agreed) (Kern, Joseph)
February 11, 2022 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Court grants Defendant's agreed motion to extend time #8 ; Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 3/10/22. The Court also extends the status report deadline to 3/15/22. The 2/15/22 Notice of Motion date is stricken. Mailed notice (gel, )
February 10, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Joseph D Kern for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #8 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 2/15/2022 at 11:00 AM. (Kern, Joseph)
February 9, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Global Payment Check Services, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Agreed) (Kern, Joseph)
February 9, 2022 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Global Payment Check Services, Inc. by Joseph D Kern (Kern, Joseph)
January 24, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aleksandr Miterin as to Global Payment Check Services, Inc. on 1/20/2022, answer due 2/10/2022. (Volheim, Nathan)
January 20, 2022 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. In addition, the parties must file a status report no later than 2/28/2022, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. During the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312) 818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. Mailed notice (gel, )
January 18, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Global Payment Check Services, Inc. (ak, )
January 14, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Aleksandr Miterin by Alejandro Emmanuel Figueroa (Figueroa, Alejandro)
January 14, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Aleksandr Miterin by Eric Donald Coleman (Coleman, Eric)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Aleksandr Miterin by Nathan Charles Volheim (Volheim, Nathan)
January 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Aleksandr Miterin; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19057884. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Volheim, Nathan)
January 14, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lxk, )
January 14, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lxk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miterin v. Global Payment Check Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aleksandr Miterin
Represented By: Alejandro Emmanuel Figueroa
Represented By: Eric Donald Coleman
Represented By: Nathan Charles Volheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Payment Check Services, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph D Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?