United States of America v. Triplett
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: James Triplett
Case Number: 1:2022cv00388
Filed: January 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255 Remedies on motion attacking sentence
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESPONSE by United States of America to MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by James Triplett #5 , MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by James Triplett #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Edenfield, Scott)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to amend/correct #4 and motion to vacate, set aside or correct sentence (2255) #5 are entered and continued. The deadline for the Government to respond to Defendant's Section 2255 motions #1 #4 #5 is extended to 3/15/2022; Defendant shall reply by 4/5/2022. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) Modified on 3/1/2022 (jlj, ).
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DECLARATION of James Triplett (Envelope postmarked 2/22/2022) (Institutional stamp 2/23/2022) (exr, )
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by James Triplett (Envelope postmarked 2/22/2022) (Institutional stamp 2/23/2022) (exr, )
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION by Defendant James Triplett to amend motion to vacate, set aside, or correct sentence and memorandum of facts and law in support of 28 U.S.C. 2255 (exr, )
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Government shall respond to Defendant's Section 2255 motion #1 by 3/1/2022; Defendant shall reply by 3/22/2022. Motion hearing set for 4/13/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (rp, )
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by James Triplett (Exhibits) (Envelope not post marked) (rp, )
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Direct assignment. (rp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Triplett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Scott M Edenfield
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Triplett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?