Atain Specialty Insurance Company v. Adventure Facility Concepts and Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ATAIN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: ADVENTURE FACILITY CONCEPTS AND MANAGEMENT, LLC d/b/a FUNTOPIA, MICHAEL WELLS and Adventure Facility Concepts and Management, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00482
Filed: January 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION by Defendant Adventure Facility Concepts and Management, LLC to dismiss (Anspach, Kenneth)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Kenneth G. Anspach for presentment of before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 3/31/2022 at 01:45 PM. (Anspach, Kenneth)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Atain Specialty Insurance Company by Charles R Vogt (Vogt, Charles)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court grants Plaintiff's motion for leave to withdraw the appearance of counsel #11 and withdraws the appearance of Keith K. Ybanez as counsel for Plaintiff. Mailed notice (rj, )
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Keith K. Ybanez for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #11 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 3/22/2022 at 09:45 AM. (Ybanez, Keith)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION by Attorney Keith K. Ybanez to withdraw as attorney for Atain Specialty Insurance Company. No party information provided (Ybanez, Keith)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court grants Defendants' motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #8 . Defendants' responsive pleading is due by 3/25/2022. The Court strikes the status date set for 3/29/2022 and resets it to 4/12/2022 at 9:30 a.m. The parties should file their joint initial status report by 4/5/2022. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Amended NOTICE of Motion by Kenneth G. Anspach for presentment of motion for hearing #8 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 3/10/2022 at 01:45 PM. (Anspach, Kenneth)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Adventure Facility Concepts and Management, LLC for hearing on Joint Scheduling Motion (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Motion)(Anspach, Kenneth)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Adventure Facility Concepts and Management, LLC by Kenneth G. Anspach (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Anspach, Kenneth)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 3/29/2022 at 9:30 AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 3/22/2022. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Adventure Facility Concepts and Management, LLC, Michael Wells (ak, )
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by ATAIN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Derrig, Craig)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ATAIN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY by Keith K. Ybanez (Ybanez, Keith)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ATAIN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY by Craig M Derrig (Derrig, Craig)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Derrig, Craig)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT filed by ATAIN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19098135. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, Application, #3 Exhibit C, Climbing Minimum Eligibility Reqts, #4 Exhibit D, Policy)(Derrig, Craig)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (cm, )
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atain Specialty Insurance Company v. Adventure Facility Concepts and Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATAIN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Keith K. Ybanez
Represented By: Craig M Derrig
Represented By: Charles R Vogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADVENTURE FACILITY CONCEPTS AND MANAGEMENT, LLC d/b/a FUNTOPIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL WELLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adventure Facility Concepts and Management, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth G. Anspach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?