Zurich American Insurance Company v. Henry F. Teichman, Inc.
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Defendant: Henry F. Teichmann, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv01015
Filed: February 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Henry F. Teichmann, Inc.(Sackett Pohlenz, Jennifer)
April 7, 2022 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court has reviewed the parties' joint status report and sets the following discovery and pretrial schedule. Written discovery requests are to be served by 5/20/2022. Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures are to be made by 5/27/2022. The deadline for amending the pleadings and adding parties is 9/10/2022. Discovery is to be completed by 10/21/2022. The deadline for filing dispositive motions is 12/2/2022. The telephonic status hearing set for 4/13/2022 is vacated and reset to 7/14/2022 at 9:05 a.m. The case management conference will be conducted by telephone, using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. A further joint status report detailing the progress of discovery and any settlement discussions is to be filed on 7/7/2022. (mk)
April 6, 2022 Filing 10 STATUS Report by Zurich American Insurance Company (Seeberg, Isabella)
March 28, 2022 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Zurich American Insurance Company by Isabella Seeberg (Seeberg, Isabella)
March 25, 2022 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time #7 is granted; response to complaint is to be filed by 4/8/2022. (mk)
March 24, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant Henry F. Teichmann, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Sackett Pohlenz, Jennifer)
March 24, 2022 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Henry F. Teichmann, Inc. by Jennifer J. Sackett Pohlenz (Sackett Pohlenz, Jennifer)
March 15, 2022 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: By no later than 4/6/2022, the parties (or, if no defendant has yet appeared, the plaintiff(s)) are to file a joint status report that includes the following information: (1) the status of service of process upon each defendant; (2) a description of each party's claims and defenses; (3) details regarding any discussions concerning settlement, whether before or after the filing of the lawsuit; (4) a proposed discovery and pretrial schedule; and (5) any other matters that any party wishes to bring to the Court's attention. The case is set for a case management conference under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 on 4/13/2022 at 8:40 a.m. The case management conference will be conducted by telephone, using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to any defendant that has not yet appeared by counsel via regular mail at the address at which the defendant has been or is to be served with process. (mk)
March 4, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zurich American Insurance Company as to Henry F. Teichmann, Inc. on 3/3/2022, answer due 3/24/2022. (Whitmer, Steven)
March 1, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Henry F. Teichmann, Inc. (sxh, )
February 25, 2022 Filing 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Zurich American Insurance Company (Whitmer, Steven)
February 25, 2022 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Zurich American Insurance Company by Steven Todd Whitmer (Whitmer, Steven)
February 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Zurich American Insurance Company; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19194086. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Whitmer, Steven)
February 25, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jxj, )
February 25, 2022 MAILED copy of the Clerk's Notice entry along with the Joint Consent Form to Defendant Henry F. Teichmann, Inc. (jxj, )
February 25, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jxj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zurich American Insurance Company v. Henry F. Teichman, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven Todd Whitmer
Represented By: Isabella Seeberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry F. Teichmann, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer J. Sackett Pohlenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?