Valladares v. Pruco Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Alejandro Valladares
Defendant: Pruco Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv01429
Filed: March 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2022 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court strikes the status hearing set for 5/5/2022 and resets it to 9/14/2022 at 9:30 a.m. for ruling on Defendant's motion to dismiss #11 . The Court sets the following briefing schedule on Defendant's motion to dismiss: Plaintiffs' response is due by 5/27/2022 and Defendant's reply is due by 6/10/2022. Mailed notice (rj, )
April 15, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Marilyn B. Rosen for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #11 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 4/26/2022 at 09:45 AM. (Rosen, Marilyn)
April 15, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Pruco Life Insurance Company Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Rosen, Marilyn)
April 12, 2022 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Alejandro Valladares by Neal S Gainsberg (Gainsberg, Neal)
March 22, 2022 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court grants Defendant's motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #5 . Defendant's responsive pleading is due by 4/15/2022. The initial status conference in this matter is set for 5/5/2022 at 1:30 PM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 4/28/2022. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
March 22, 2022 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Alejandro Valladares by Samantha Gutierrez (Gutierrez, Samantha)
March 21, 2022 Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record (kl, )
March 21, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by Marilyn B. Rosen for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #5 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 3/23/2022 at 09:45 AM. (Rosen, Marilyn)
March 21, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION by Defendant Pruco Life Insurance Company for extension of time to file answer Uncontested Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint (Rosen, Marilyn)
March 18, 2022 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Pruco Life Insurance Company Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rosen, Marilyn)
March 18, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Pruco Life Insurance Company by Marilyn B. Rosen (Rosen, Marilyn)
March 18, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Rosen, Marilyn)
March 18, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from The Cook County Circuit Court, case number (2021-L-011539) filed by Pruco Life Insurance Company Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19258834. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint)(Rosen, Marilyn)
March 18, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jk2, )
March 18, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jk2, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valladares v. Pruco Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Valladares
Represented By: Neal S Gainsberg
Represented By: Samantha Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pruco Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Marilyn B. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?