Tesfabruk v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security (DHS), et al
Plaintiff: Tsigeweini Yohanes Tesfabruk
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, a federal agency, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, a federal agency, U.S. Department of State, Director Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Antony Blinken, U.S. Department of Homeland Security (DHS) and U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)
Case Number: 1:2022cv01460
Filed: March 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2022 Filing 8 DESIGNATION of Elizabeth Inez Treacy as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Antony Blinken, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), U.S. Department of Homeland Security (DHS), U.S. Department of State (Treacy, Elizabeth)
April 12, 2022 Filing 7 DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Antony Blinken, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), U.S. Department of Homeland Security (DHS), U.S. Department of State (Oswald, Craig)
March 24, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Antony Blinken, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), U.S. Department of Homeland Security (DHS), U.S. Department of State, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (ey, )
March 23, 2022 Filing 6 COMPLAINT filed by Tsigeweini Yohanes Tesfabruk (Exhibits). (aee, )
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 3/23/2022. Mailed notice (aee, )
March 21, 2022 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Tsigeweini Yohanes Tesfabruk for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Olivas, Karla)
March 21, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tsigeweini Yohanes Tesfabruk by Karla Olivas (Olivas, Karla)
March 21, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Olivas, Karla)
March 21, 2022 Filing 1 RECEIVED COMPLAINT filed by Tsigeweini Yohanes Tesfabruk; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Olivas, Karla) Modified on 3/22/2022 (aee, ).
March 21, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ak, )
March 21, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ak, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tesfabruk v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security (DHS), et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tsigeweini Yohanes Tesfabruk
Represented By: Karla Olivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, a federal agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, a federal agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of State
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antony Blinken
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security (DHS)
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?