Aviles v. Northwestern University et al
Plaintiff: Jose Aviles
Defendant: Northwestern University and Northwestern University Benevolent and Protective Association
Case Number: 1:2022cv01470
Filed: March 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Referring Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2022 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: The Court sets the following briefing schedule on Defendant's motion for misjoinder, or in the alternative, motion to dismiss pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) #17 as follows: Plaintiff to respond by 6/10/2022. Defendant to reply by 6/24/2022. Ruling before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 7/26/2022 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
May 16, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Jason William Lee for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #17 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 5/20/2022 at 09:45 AM. (Lee, Jason)
May 10, 2022 Filing 17 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Northwestern University Benevolent and Protective Association (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service to Plaintiff and Defendant Northwestern, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Motion/Filing)(Lee, Jason)
April 11, 2022 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Motion for extension of time to answer #15 is granted. Responses to corrected petition to vacate arbitration award #4 due by 5/23/2022; reply due by 6/13/2022. Ruling set for 7/26/2022 (for tracking purposes only; no appearances required). The court will rule by mail. The parties to note Judge Bucklo's standing order posted on her page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov requiring motions to be noticed for hearing. Mailed notice (reg)
April 1, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant Northwestern University Benevolent and Protective Association for extension of time to file answer (Unopposed) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lee, Jason)
April 1, 2022 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Northwestern University Benevolent and Protective Association by Jason William Lee (Lee, Jason)
March 30, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE by Jose Aviles re summons returned executed #12 (Smith, Zane)
March 30, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jose Aviles as to Northwestern University on 3/24/2022, answer due 4/14/2022. (Smith, Zane)
March 29, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Northwestern University for extension of time to file answer or otherwise respond (UNOPPOSED) (Wermuth, Anneliese)
March 29, 2022 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Northwestern University by Anneliese Wermuth (Wermuth, Anneliese)
March 24, 2022 Filing 9 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo for all further proceedings. Honorable Mary M. Rowland no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/24/2022. (bg, )
March 22, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jose Aviles as to Northwestern University Benevolent and Protective Association on 3/22/2022, answer due 4/12/2022. (Samovalov, Boris)
March 22, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE by Jose Aviles re certificate of service #6 of Petition to Vacate (Samovalov, Boris)
March 22, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service of Petition to Vacate by Boris G Samovalov on behalf of Jose Aviles (Samovalov, Boris)
March 22, 2022 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jose Aviles by Boris G Samovalov (Samovalov, Boris)
March 22, 2022 Filing 4 CORRECTION PETITION by Jose Aviles to vacate arbitration award (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Smith, Zane) (Docket text modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 3/23/2022 (bg, ).
March 22, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jose Aviles by Zane D. Smith (Smith, Zane)
March 22, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Northwestern University, Northwestern University Benevolent and Protective Association (ak, )
March 21, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Genson, Sheila)
March 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jose Aviles ; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19264587. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Genson, Sheila)
March 21, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ak, )
March 21, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ak, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aviles v. Northwestern University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Aviles
Represented By: Sheila Ann Genson
Represented By: Zane D. Smith
Represented By: Boris G Samovalov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwestern University
Represented By: Anneliese Wermuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwestern University Benevolent and Protective Association
Represented By: Jason William Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?