Finch et al v. Treto
Plaintiff: Juan Finch, Jr. and Mark Toigo
Defendant: Mario Jr. Treto
Case Number: 1:2022cv01508
Filed: March 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STATUS Report regarding state court litigation by Mario Jr. Treto (Huszagh, Richard)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Oral argument held on 4/22/2022. Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction #6 is taken under advisement. Mailed notice (mjc, )
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Plaintiffs' unopposed motion to exceed page limitation #21 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, )
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION by Plaintiffs Juan Finch, Jr, Mark Toigo for leave to file excess pages Unopposed (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Reply Brief In Support Of Motion For Temporary Restraining Order And Preliminary Injunction)(Adams, John)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE by Defendant Mario Jr. Treto to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consolidation Order, Cook County Circuit Court, 11/29/21, #2 Exhibit Illinois Supreme Court Rule 384 orders, 10/18/21 and 12/23/21, #3 Exhibit Abundis Declaration, #4 Exhibit Houston Affidavit, #5 Exhibit Leung Declaration, #6 Exhibit Lopez Declaration)(Bhave, Sunil)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Defendant's unopposed motion for leave to file excess pages #18 is granted. Mailed notice (mjc, )
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION by Defendant Mario Jr. Treto for leave to file excess pages Unopposed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction)(Bhave, Sunil)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mario Jr. Treto by Richard Scott Huszagh (Huszagh, Richard)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mario Jr. Treto by Hal Dworkin (Dworkin, Hal)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mario Jr. Treto by R. Douglas Rees (Rees, R.)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mario Jr. Treto by Sunil Shashikant Bhave (Bhave, Sunil)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Mark Toigo, Juan Finch, Jr. Mario Jr. Treto waiver sent on 3/28/2022, answer due 5/27/2022. (Adams, John)
April 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 3/24/2022 before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. TRO Hearing. Order Number: 42900. Court Reporter Contact Information: TRACEY D. McCULLOUGH, 312-435-5570, tracey_mccullough@ilnd.uscourts.gov.
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and Briefing Schedule Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/24/2022. Mailed notice(mjc, )
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Video hearing held on Plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order. On Defense counsel's assurance that no conditional license will be issue between now and further order of this court, the motion #6 is denied without prejudice. Defense counsel will prepare and submit a written stipulation to this effect. The parties will submit briefs on Plaintiffs' claims as follows: Defendant's response brief is due on 4/8/2022; Plaintiffs have leave to reply on or before 4/15/2022. Oral argument set for 4/22/2022 at 2:00 p.m. Mailed notice (mjc, )
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file excess pages limitation #7 is granted. Mailed notice (mjc, )
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion hearing set for 3/24/22 at 10:30 a.m. on plaintiffs' emergency motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction #6 and plaintiffs' motion for leave to exceed page limitation #7 . The motion hearing will be held via Microsoft Teams. Mailed notice (mjc, )
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiffs Juan Finch, Jr, Mark Toigo for leave to file excess pages EMERGENCY (Attachments: #1 Proposed Memorandum in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Declaration of Pl. Juan Finch, Jr., #3 Declaration of Pl. Mark Toigo)(Adams, John)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiffs Juan Finch, Jr, Mark Toigo for temporary restraining order EMERGENCY (Attachments: #1 J. Adams' Declaration and Certification Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b) and LR 5.5(d), #2 J. Adams' Declaration iso Pls' TRO Motion, #3 Exhibit 1 - J. Adams' Declaration iso Pls' TRO Motion, #4 Exhibit 2 - J. Adams' Declaration iso Pls' TRO Motion)(Adams, John)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Juan Finch, Jr, Mark Toigo by John David Tripoli (Tripoli, John)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Juan Finch, Jr, Mark Toigo by Daniel D Birk (Birk, Daniel)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Juan Finch, Jr, Mark Toigo by John K. Adams (Adams, John)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Adams, John)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mark Toigo, Juan Finch, Jr; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19272597.(Adams, John)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, )
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (dxb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finch et al v. Treto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Finch, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel D Birk
Represented By: John David Tripoli
Represented By: John K. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Toigo
Represented By: Daniel D Birk
Represented By: John David Tripoli
Represented By: John K. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Jr. Treto
Represented By: R. Douglas Rees
Represented By: Richard Scott Huszagh
Represented By: Hal Dworkin
Represented By: Sunil Shashikant Bhave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?