Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Skudder et al
Plaintiff: Commodity Futures Trading Commission, Global AG LLC and Nesvick Trading Group LLC
Defendant: David Skudder
Case Number: 1:2022cv01925
Filed: April 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2022 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM by Global AG LLC, Nesvick Trading Group LLC, David Skudder in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #10 (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - CFTC Complaints)(Wheeler, Ellen)
June 13, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Global AG LLC, Nesvick Trading Group LLC, David Skudder (Wheeler, Ellen)
June 9, 2022 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for leave to file excess pages #8 is granted. Defendants may file a brief up to 25 pages. The parties must propose a briefing schedule on the forthcoming motion to dismiss in their joint initial status report, due 6/16/22. (mss)
June 8, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendants Global AG LLC, Nesvick Trading Group LLC, David Skudder for leave to file excess pages unopposed (Wheeler, Ellen)
June 8, 2022 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Global AG LLC, Nesvick Trading Group LLC, David Skudder by Ellen M. Wheeler (Wheeler, Ellen)
May 23, 2022 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: By 6/16/22, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, )
April 21, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. David Skudder waiver sent on 4/14/2022, answer due 6/13/2022. (Sloey, Nicholas)
April 21, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. Nesvick Trading Group LLC waiver sent on 4/14/2022, answer due 6/13/2022. (Sloey, Nicholas)
April 21, 2022 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. Global AG LLC waiver sent on 4/14/2022, answer due 6/13/2022. (Sloey, Nicholas)
April 19, 2022 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Commodity Futures Trading Commission by Nicholas Shaun Sloey (Sloey, Nicholas)
April 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission; Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ashley, Clemon)
April 14, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cxr, )
April 14, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (cxr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Skudder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By: Clemon D Ashley
Represented By: Nicholas Shaun Sloey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global AG LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nesvick Trading Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Skudder
Represented By: Ellen M. Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?