Barry v. Ms DeJesus et al
Plaintiff: Zachary Barry
Defendant: Ms DeJesus, John Doe and Tom Dart
Case Number: 1:2022cv02208
Filed: April 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: By order dated May 10, 2022, the Court denied Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and ordered him to either submit a renewed, complete application or pay the statutory filing fee #5 . Plaintiff had until June 3, 2022, to choose how he wanted to proceed. Plaintiff has yet to submit a renewed application or pay the filing fee. In the Court's May 10 order, it warned Plaintiff that failure to address his filing-fee status would result in summary dismissal of this case. This case is dismissed without prejudice, and the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all pending motions as moot. Case closed. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 6/24/2022. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
May 23, 2022 Filing 7 RECEIVED Document by Zachary Barry. (Envelope postmark date 5/17/22). (gcy, )
May 23, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Zachary Barry reappoinent Atteny.(Envelope postmark date 5/17/22). (gcy, )
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied without prejudice as incomplete. Plaintiff is directed to either (1) submit a renewed and complete application that is signed by Plaintiff, certified by a trust fund officer, and that includes a completed trust certification and a copy of Plaintiff's trust fund statement showing all transactions in his account for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of his complaint; or (2) pay the full statutory filing fee of $402.00. Failure to comply with this order by June 3, 2022, will result in summary dismissal of this case. Plaintiff must promptly update his address if it changes while this case is pending. If he fails to do so, this case will be subject to dismissal with no further warning. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 5/10/2022. Mailed notice. (exr, )
May 10, 2022 MAILED a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of the order dated 5/10/2022 to plaintiff (exr, )
April 28, 2022 MAILED copy of clerk's notice and consent form to Plaintiff (jg, )
April 28, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jg, )
April 27, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Zachary Barry for attorney representation (jg, )
April 27, 2022 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Zachary Barry for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibits) (jg, )
April 27, 2022 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (jg, )
April 27, 2022 Filing 1 RECEIVED COMPLAINT and 0 copies by Zachary Barry; Jury Demand. (Envelope not postmarked) (jg, )
April 27, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barry v. Ms DeJesus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms DeJesus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Dart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?