Chicago Teachers Union, Local 1, IFT-AFT et al v. Educators for Excellence, Inc.
Plaintiff: Chicago Teachers Union, Local 1 American Federation of Teachers, AFL-CIO, Moselean Parker and Chicago Teachers Union, Local 1, IFT-AFT
Defendant: Educators for Excellence and Educators for Excellence, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv02659
Filed: May 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0401 Labor Management Disclosure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2022 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #14 is entered and continued. Plaintiffs shall respond by 8/4/2022; Defendant shall reply by 8/18/2022. Motion hearing set for 9/9/2022 at 10:00 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the 9/9/2022 hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 7, 2022 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM by Educators for Excellence, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction,, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #14 (Martin, Craig)
July 7, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant Educators for Excellence, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Educators for Excellence, Inc. (DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT) (Martin, Craig)
June 23, 2022 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time to answer #10 is granted. The deadline for Defendant to file a responsive pleading is extended to 7/7/2022.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 21, 2022 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Educators for Excellence, Inc. by Mengjie Zou (Zou, Mengjie)
June 21, 2022 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Educators for Excellence, Inc. by Laura L. Norris (Norris, Laura)
June 21, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant Educators for Excellence, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD IN RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT) (Martin, Craig)
June 21, 2022 Filing 9 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Educators for Excellence, Inc. (Martin, Craig)
June 21, 2022 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Educators for Excellence, Inc. by Craig Christopher Martin (Martin, Craig)
June 3, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chicago Teachers Union, Local 1, IFT-AFT, Moselean Parker as to Educators for Excellence, Inc. on 6/2/2022, answer due 6/23/2022. (Bloom, Willem)
May 27, 2022 Filing 6 counsel MOTION by Plaintiffs Chicago Teachers Union, Local 1, IFT-AFT, Moselean Parker for leave to appear as counsel (Persoon, Michael)
May 27, 2022 Filing 5 counsel MOTION by Plaintiffs Chicago Teachers Union, Local 1, IFT-AFT, Moselean Parker for leave to appear as counsel (Bloom, Willem)
May 27, 2022 Filing 4 lead counsel MOTION by Plaintiffs Chicago Teachers Union, Local 1, IFT-AFT, Moselean Parker for leave to appear as lead counsel (Geoghegan, Thomas)
May 27, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Educators for Excellence, Inc. (ak, )
May 25, 2022 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Initial status hearing set for 7/29/2022 at 9:15 a.m. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 7/21/2022. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov) for details on the Initial Status Hearing and Initial Status Report. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 20, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
May 20, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lma, )
May 19, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Bloom, Willem)
May 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Chicago Teachers Union, Local 1 American Federation of Teachers, AFL-CIO, Moselean Parker; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19484150.(Bloom, Willem)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chicago Teachers Union, Local 1, IFT-AFT et al v. Educators for Excellence, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chicago Teachers Union, Local 1 American Federation of Teachers, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Willem Watson Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moselean Parker
Represented By: Willem Watson Bloom
Represented By: Michael Paul Persoon
Represented By: Thomas Howard Geoghegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chicago Teachers Union, Local 1, IFT-AFT
Represented By: Thomas Howard Geoghegan
Represented By: Michael Paul Persoon
Represented By: Willem Watson Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Educators for Excellence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Educators for Excellence, Inc.
Represented By: Craig Christopher Martin
Represented By: Laura L. Norris
Represented By: Mengjie Zou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?