Treppel Family Trust, Derivatively on Behalf of Abbvie Inc. v. Gonzalez et al
Plaintiff: Treppel Family Trust, Derivatively on Behalf of Abbvie Inc.
Defendant: Richard A. Gonzalez, Michael E. Severino, Robert A. Michael, Jeffrey R. Stewart, Glenn F. Tilton, M.D. Robert J. Alpern, Roxanne S. Austin, William H.L. Burnside, Frederick H. Waddell, Edward J. Rapp, Edward M. Liddy, Brett J. Hart, Melody B. Meyer, Rebecca B. Roberts, Thomas C. Freyman and AbbVie Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv02718
Filed: May 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Referring Judge: John F Kness
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2022 Filing 32 REPLY by Plaintiff Treppel Family Trust, Derivatively on Behalf of Abbvie Inc. to memorandum in support of motion, #30 , motion to consolidate cases #29 (Forde, Michael)
July 19, 2022 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM by AbbVie Inc., Robert J. Alpern, Roxanne S. Austin, William H.L. Burnside, Thomas C. Freyman, Richard A. Gonzalez, Brett J. Hart, Edward M. Liddy, Melody B. Meyer, Robert A. Michael, Edward J. Rapp, Rebecca B. Roberts, Michael E. Severino, Jeffrey R. Stewart, Glenn F. Tilton, Frederick H. Waddell in Opposition to motion to consolidate cases #29 (Rabinovitz, Joshua)
July 18, 2022 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM by Treppel Family Trust, Derivatively on Behalf of Abbvie Inc. in support of motion to consolidate cases #29 and appointment of co-lead counsel and liaison counsel (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Forde, Michael)
July 18, 2022 Filing 29 MOTION by Plaintiff Treppel Family Trust, Derivatively on Behalf of Abbvie Inc. to consolidate cases and appointment of co-lead counsel and liaison counsel (Forde, Michael)
July 11, 2022 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Motion by counsel for leave to appear pro hac vice #27 is granted. Mailed notice (ef, )
July 8, 2022 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19634847. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Carrino, Eric)
July 6, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION by Plaintiff Treppel Family Trust, Derivatively on Behalf of Abbvie Inc. to reassign case UNOPPOSED (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Forde, Michael)
June 30, 2022 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Before the Court is the motion to dismiss #23 of Defendants Edward J. Rapp, Robert J. Alpern, Richard A. Gonzalez, AbbVie Inc., Thomas C. Freyman, Brett J. Hart, Glenn F. Tilton, Michael E. Severino, William H.L. Burnside, Edward M. Liddy, Melody B. Meyer, Rebecca B. Roberts, Roxanne S. Austin, Robert A. Michael, Frederick H. Waddell, and Jeffrey R. Stewart. As is reflected in the Court's standing order on motions to dismiss, the parties are advised that, when a motion to dismiss is filed, the nonmoving party has a right to amend its pleading once within 21 days. Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B). Consistent with the purpose of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure "to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, Plaintiff is directed to review Defendants' motion to dismiss and to consider exercising, as appropriate, Plaintiff's right to amend under Rule 15(a)(1)(B). If Plaintiff elects to amend its pleading in response to the motion to dismiss, then Defendants (unless otherwise ordered) must, within 21 days of the amended pleading, file either an answer or a renewed motion to dismiss. If Plaintiff elects not to amend but instead chooses to litigate the motion to dismiss, Plaintiff (unless ordered otherwise) must file its response within 28 days of the filing of the motion, and Defendants must file its reply within 14 days of the filing of the response. In its response, Plaintiff must also address whether any alleged deficiencies identified by the motion to dismiss are curable by amendment. Mailed notice (ef, )
June 27, 2022 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM by AbbVie Inc., Robert J. Alpern, Roxanne S. Austin, William H.L. Burnside, Thomas C. Freyman, Richard A. Gonzalez, Brett J. Hart, Edward M. Liddy, Melody B. Meyer, Robert A. Michael, Edward J. Rapp, Rebecca B. Roberts, Michael E. Severino, Jeffrey R. Stewart, Glenn F. Tilton, Frederick H. Waddell in support of motion to dismiss, #23 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Rabinovitz, Joshua)
June 27, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION by Defendants Edward J. Rapp, Robert J. Alpern, Richard A. Gonzalez, AbbVie Inc., Thomas C. Freyman, Brett J. Hart, Glenn F. Tilton, Michael E. Severino, William H.L. Burnside, Edward M. Liddy, Melody B. Meyer, Rebecca B. Roberts, Roxanne S. Austin, Robert A. Michael, Frederick H. Waddell, Jeffrey R. Stewart to dismiss (Rabinovitz, Joshua)
June 27, 2022 Filing 22 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Defendants (Rabinovitz, Joshua)
June 3, 2022 Filing 21 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable John F. Kness for all further proceedings. Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo no longer assigned to the case pursuant to 28:294(b). Signed by Executive Committee on 6/3/22. (nsf, )
May 31, 2022 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Treppel Family Trust, Derivatively on Behalf of Abbvie Inc.. Frederick H. Waddell waiver sent on 5/24/2022, answer due 7/25/2022. (O'Meara, Brian)
May 31, 2022 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Treppel Family Trust, Derivatively on Behalf of Abbvie Inc.. Glenn F. Tilton waiver sent on 5/24/2022, answer due 7/25/2022. (O'Meara, Brian)
May 31, 2022 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Treppel Family Trust, Derivatively on Behalf of Abbvie Inc.. Jeffrey R. Stewart waiver sent on 5/24/2022, answer due 7/25/2022. (O'Meara, Brian)
May 31, 2022 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Treppel Family Trust, Derivatively on Behalf of Abbvie Inc.. Michael E. Severino waiver sent on 5/24/2022, answer due 7/25/2022. (O'Meara, Brian)
May 31, 2022 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Treppel Family Trust, Derivatively on Behalf of Abbvie Inc.. Rebecca B. Roberts waiver sent on 5/24/2022, answer due 7/25/2022. (O'Meara, Brian)
May 31, 2022 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Treppel Family Trust, Derivatively on Behalf of Abbvie Inc.. Edward J. Rapp waiver sent on 5/24/2022, answer due 7/25/2022. (O'Meara, Brian)
May 31, 2022 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Treppel Family Trust, Derivatively on Behalf of Abbvie Inc.. Robert A. Michael waiver sent on 5/24/2022, answer due 7/25/2022. (O'Meara, Brian)
May 31, 2022 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Treppel Family Trust, Derivatively on Behalf of Abbvie Inc.. Melody B. Meyer waiver sent on 5/24/2022, answer due 7/25/2022. (O'Meara, Brian)
May 31, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Treppel Family Trust, Derivatively on Behalf of Abbvie Inc.. Edward M. Liddy waiver sent on 5/24/2022, answer due 7/25/2022. (O'Meara, Brian)
May 31, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Treppel Family Trust, Derivatively on Behalf of Abbvie Inc.. Brett J. Hart waiver sent on 5/24/2022, answer due 7/25/2022. (O'Meara, Brian)
May 31, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Treppel Family Trust, Derivatively on Behalf of Abbvie Inc.. Richard A. Gonzalez waiver sent on 5/24/2022, answer due 7/25/2022. (O'Meara, Brian)
May 31, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Treppel Family Trust, Derivatively on Behalf of Abbvie Inc.. Thomas C. Freyman waiver sent on 5/24/2022, answer due 7/25/2022. (O'Meara, Brian)
May 31, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Treppel Family Trust, Derivatively on Behalf of Abbvie Inc.. William H.L. Burnside waiver sent on 5/24/2022, answer due 7/25/2022. (O'Meara, Brian)
May 31, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Treppel Family Trust, Derivatively on Behalf of Abbvie Inc.. Roxanne S. Austin waiver sent on 5/24/2022, answer due 7/25/2022. (O'Meara, Brian)
May 31, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Treppel Family Trust, Derivatively on Behalf of Abbvie Inc.. Robert J. Alpern waiver sent on 5/24/2022, answer due 7/25/2022. (O'Meara, Brian)
May 31, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Treppel Family Trust, Derivatively on Behalf of Abbvie Inc.. AbbVie Inc. waiver sent on 5/24/2022, answer due 7/25/2022. (O'Meara, Brian)
May 24, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants AbbVie Inc., Richard A. Gonzalez (jk2, )
May 23, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Treppel Family Trust, Derivatively on Behalf of Abbvie Inc. by Brian Patrick O'Meara (O'Meara, Brian)
May 23, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Treppel Family Trust, Derivatively on Behalf of Abbvie Inc. by Michael K. Forde (Forde, Michael)
May 23, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (O'Meara, Brian)
May 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Treppel Family Trust, Derivatively on Behalf of Abbvie Inc.; Y. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19492603.(O'Meara, Brian)
May 23, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jxj, )
May 23, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jxj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Treppel Family Trust, Derivatively on Behalf of Abbvie Inc. v. Gonzalez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Treppel Family Trust, Derivatively on Behalf of Abbvie Inc.
Represented By: Michael K. Forde
Represented By: Brian Patrick O'Meara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A. Gonzalez
Represented By: Joshua Z Rabinovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael E. Severino
Represented By: Joshua Z Rabinovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Michael
Represented By: Joshua Z Rabinovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey R. Stewart
Represented By: Joshua Z Rabinovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn F. Tilton
Represented By: Joshua Z Rabinovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Robert J. Alpern
Represented By: Joshua Z Rabinovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxanne S. Austin
Represented By: Joshua Z Rabinovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William H.L. Burnside
Represented By: Joshua Z Rabinovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick H. Waddell
Represented By: Joshua Z Rabinovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward J. Rapp
Represented By: Joshua Z Rabinovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward M. Liddy
Represented By: Joshua Z Rabinovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett J. Hart
Represented By: Joshua Z Rabinovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melody B. Meyer
Represented By: Joshua Z Rabinovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca B. Roberts
Represented By: Joshua Z Rabinovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas C. Freyman
Represented By: Joshua Z Rabinovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Z Rabinovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?