IBEW Local 117 Pension Fund et al v. NUCORE ELECTRIC, INC.
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 117 Pension Fund, IBEW Local 117 Vacation Fund, IBEW LOCAL 117 LABOR-MANAGEMENT COOPERATION FUND, MCHENRY COUNTY ELECTRICAL JOINT APPRENTICESHIP & TRUST FUND, IBEW LOCAL 117 ADMINISTRATIVE MAINTENANCE FUND, IBEW LOCAL 117 WORKING ASSESSMENT FUND, JESSE LENART IN HIS CAPACITY AS TRUSTEE AND REPRESENTATIVE OF THE FUNDS and Jesse Lenart
Defendant: NUCORE ELECTRIC, INC.
Case Number: 1:2022cv02802
Filed: May 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Marvin E Aspen
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE by IBEW LOCAL 117 ADMINISTRATIVE MAINTENANCE FUND, IBEW LOCAL 117 LABOR-MANAGEMENT COOPERATION FUND, IBEW LOCAL 117 WORKING ASSESSMENT FUND, IBEW Local 117 Pension Fund, IBEW Local 117 Vacation Fund, Jesse Lenart, MCHENRY COUNTY ELECTRICAL JOINT APPRENTICESHIP & TRUST FUND re affidavit #8 (Kedziora, Martin)
July 19, 2022 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Jesse Lenart regarding text entry, #7 (Stibbe, Paul)
June 27, 2022 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Plaintiff shall file an affidavit of prove-up damages, serve on defendant and give the defendant two weeks to respond. The status hearing remains set for 8/18/2022 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags)
June 24, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiffs IBEW LOCAL 117 ADMINISTRATIVE MAINTENANCE FUND, IBEW LOCAL 117 LABOR-MANAGEMENT COOPERATION FUND, IBEW LOCAL 117 WORKING ASSESSMENT FUND, IBEW Local 117 Pension Fund, IBEW Local 117 Vacation Fund, Jesse Lenart, MCHENRY COUNTY ELECTRICAL JOINT APPRENTICESHIP & TRUST FUND for entry of default (Kedziora, Martin)
May 31, 2022 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Initial status hearing is set for 8/18/2022 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags)
May 31, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant NUCORE ELECTRIC, INC. (rp, )
May 27, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Stibbe, Paul)
May 27, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs IBEW LOCAL 117 ADMINISTRATIVE MAINTENANCE FUND, IBEW LOCAL 117 LABOR-MANAGEMENT COOPERATION FUND, IBEW LOCAL 117 WORKING ASSESSMENT FUND, IBEW Local 117 Pension Fund, IBEW Local 117 Vacation Fund, JESSE LENART IN HIS CAPACITY AS TRUSTEE AND REPRESENTATIVE OF THE FUNDS, MCHENRY COUNTY ELECTRICAL JOINT APPRENTICESHIP & TRUST FUND by Martin S. Kedziora (Kedziora, Martin)
May 27, 2022 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs IBEW LOCAL 117 ADMINISTRATIVE MAINTENANCE FUND, IBEW LOCAL 117 LABOR-MANAGEMENT COOPERATION FUND, IBEW LOCAL 117 WORKING ASSESSMENT FUND, IBEW Local 117 Pension Fund, IBEW Local 117 Vacation Fund, JESSE LENART IN HIS CAPACITY AS TRUSTEE AND REPRESENTATIVE OF THE FUNDS, MCHENRY COUNTY ELECTRICAL JOINT APPRENTICESHIP & TRUST FUND by Paul Frederick Stibbe (Stibbe, Paul)
May 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by IBEW LOCAL 117 WORKING ASSESSMENT FUND, IBEW LOCAL 117 LABOR-MANAGEMENT COOPERATION FUND, JESSE LENART IN HIS CAPACITY AS TRUSTEE AND REPRESENTATIVE OF THE FUNDS, IBEW Local 117 Vacation Fund, IBEW Local 117 Pension Fund, MCHENRY COUNTY ELECTRICAL JOINT APPRENTICESHIP & TRUST FUND, IBEW LOCAL 117 ADMINISTRATIVE MAINTENANCE FUND; n. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19509282. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stibbe, Paul)
May 27, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ak, )
May 27, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ak, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IBEW Local 117 Pension Fund et al v. NUCORE ELECTRIC, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 117 Pension Fund
Represented By: Martin S. Kedziora
Represented By: Paul Frederick Stibbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 117 Vacation Fund
Represented By: Martin S. Kedziora
Represented By: Paul Frederick Stibbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW LOCAL 117 LABOR-MANAGEMENT COOPERATION FUND
Represented By: Martin S. Kedziora
Represented By: Paul Frederick Stibbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCHENRY COUNTY ELECTRICAL JOINT APPRENTICESHIP & TRUST FUND
Represented By: Martin S. Kedziora
Represented By: Paul Frederick Stibbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW LOCAL 117 ADMINISTRATIVE MAINTENANCE FUND
Represented By: Martin S. Kedziora
Represented By: Paul Frederick Stibbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW LOCAL 117 WORKING ASSESSMENT FUND
Represented By: Martin S. Kedziora
Represented By: Paul Frederick Stibbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSE LENART IN HIS CAPACITY AS TRUSTEE AND REPRESENTATIVE OF THE FUNDS
Represented By: Martin S. Kedziora
Represented By: Paul Frederick Stibbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Lenart
Represented By: Martin S. Kedziora
Represented By: Paul Frederick Stibbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NUCORE ELECTRIC, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?