Damian v. Smithamundsen, LLC
Plaintiff: Melanie E. Damian, as Receiver for Today's Growth Consultant, Inc. (dba The Income Store) and Melanie E. Damian
Defendant: Smithamundsen, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv02830
Filed: May 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendant's Motion for leave to withdraw request for settlement conference and for extension of time to respond to Complaint #13 is granted. Motion #11 is withdrawn. Response to Complaint shall be filed by 8/5/2022. Initial Status hearing set for 8/18/2022 stands. Please refer to Minute Entry #2 regarding Webex instructions. Motion hearing set for 7/12/2022 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Ramses Jalalpour for presentment of motion to withdraw, extension of time #13 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 7/12/2022 at 09:00 AM. (Jalalpour, Ramses)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant Smithamundsen, LLC to withdraw Request for Settlement Conference, MOTION by Defendant Smithamundsen, LLC for extension of time to Respond to the Receiver's Complaint (Jalalpour, Ramses)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas A Culmo for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #11 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 7/12/2022 at 09:00 AM. (Culmo, Thomas)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Melanie E. DamianJoint Motion to Refer Parties to Settlement Conference with Magistrate Judge and for Extension of Time for Defendant to File Its Response to the Complaint Until After the Settlement Conference has Concluded (Should the Parties Reach Impasse) Unopposed (Culmo, Thomas)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Smithamundsen, LLC by Ramses Jalalpour (Jalalpour, Ramses)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Smithamundsen, LLC by Victor J. Pioli (Pioli, Victor)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Smithamundsen, LLC by Joseph R. Marconi (Marconi, Joseph)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Melanie E. Damian by Kevin Buckley Duff (Duff, Kevin)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melanie E. Damian as to Smithamundsen, LLC on 6/8/2022, answer due 6/29/2022. (Murena, Kenneth)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Attorney Thomas Culmo's Motion to appear pro hac vice #4 is granted. Mailed notice (lk, )
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19545795. (Culmo, Thomas)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Minute Entry #2 is corrected as follows: Initial Status hearing set for 8/18/2022 at 9:00 AM which will proceed via Webex. Joint Status Report due by 8/15/2022. Mailed notice (lk, )
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial Status hearing set for 5/18/2022 at 9:00 AM which will proceed via Webex. Joint Status Report due by 5/15/2022. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Webex instructions are as follows: Prior to the hearing, you are directed to cut and paste this hyper link into a browser: https://us-courts.webex.com/join/virginia_kendallilnd.uscourts.gov If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (650)-479-3207, the access code is: 180 698 4009. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone and turn off your video until your case is called. If calling in due to not having access to a computer, please remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function. Please test the sound quality and video functions of your device in advance. Members of the public and media are directed to call in to listen to hearings. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Participant instructions for Webex are attached. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Webex Participant Instructions) (lk, )
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Smithamundsen, LLC (emc, )
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Calasanz, Emily)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (emc, )
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Melanie E. Damian, as Receiver for Today's Growth Consultant, Inc. (dba The Income Store); Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19512458. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Murena, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Damian v. Smithamundsen, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie E. Damian, as Receiver for Today's Growth Consultant, Inc. (dba The Income Store)
Represented By: Kenneth Dante Murena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie E. Damian
Represented By: Kevin Buckley Duff
Represented By: Thomas A Culmo
Represented By: Kenneth Dante Murena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smithamundsen, LLC
Represented By: Joseph R. Marconi
Represented By: Ramses Jalalpour
Represented By: Victor J. Pioli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?