Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC et al v. Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC and Leiutis Pharmaceuticals LLP
Defendant: Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv02868
Filed: June 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2022 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Claimant Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Imron T Aly (Aly, Imron)
July 28, 2022 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Claimant Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Sailesh K. Patel (Patel, Sailesh)
July 25, 2022 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Claimant Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Joel M Wallace (Wallace, Joel)
July 25, 2022 Filing 16 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Wallace, Joel)
July 25, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and COUNTERCLAIM filed by Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. against Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Leiutis Pharmaceuticals LLP . by Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(Wallace, Joel)
June 23, 2022 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Plaintiff's motion to amend proof of service #12 is granted. The proof of service filed on June 9, 2022 and answer date of June 27, 2022 are vacated. Waiver of Service was returned executed on 6/22/22. Answer is due 8/15/22. The deadline of 8/3/22 for parties to file a report of the parties' planning meeting #8 is reset to 8/29/22. Mailed notice. (dm, )
June 23, 2022 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Motion to appear pro hac vice by Michael Dzwonczyk #11 is granted. Counsel is reminded to become familiar with this court's local rules (including the rules requiring local counsel and describing this court's trial bar). Mailed notice. (dm, )
June 22, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Leiutis Pharmaceuticals LLPMotion to Amend Proof of Service Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l)(3) (Griffith, Christopher)
June 22, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19584542. Michael R. Dzwonczyk (Griffith, Christopher)
June 22, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Leiutis Pharmaceuticals LLP. Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 6/15/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. (Griffith, Christopher)
June 9, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Leiutis Pharmaceuticals LLP as to Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 6/6/2022, answer due 6/27/2022. (Griffith, Christopher)
June 7, 2022 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On or before 8/3/22, the parties shall file a report of the parties' planning meeting pursuant to LPR 1.2. A template for the report setting forth the information required may be found in Judge Rowland's standing order on Patent Cases, available on her webpage, by clicking the link in the Patent Cases standing order, "LPR Appendix A." Parties shall also report on the status of any settlement discussions. Mailed notice. (dm, )
June 3, 2022 Filing 7 MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: #1 (List of Patents))(ph, )
June 3, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (khg, )
June 1, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Claims Involving Patents Under Local Rule 3.4 by Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Leiutis Pharmaceuticals LLP (Griffith, Christopher)
June 1, 2022 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Leiutis Pharmaceuticals LLP (Griffith, Christopher)
June 1, 2022 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC (Griffith, Christopher)
June 1, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Leiutis Pharmaceuticals LLP by Christopher Thomas Griffith (Griffith, Christopher)
June 1, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Griffith, Christopher)
June 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Leiutis Pharmaceuticals LLP; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19518503. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A. - US Patent 10,993,952)(Griffith, Christopher)
June 1, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (khg, )
June 1, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (khg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC et al v. Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingenus Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leiutis Pharmaceuticals LLP
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nexus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Imron T Aly
Represented By: Sailesh K. Patel
Represented By: Joel M Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?