O.F.C.C. v U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Plaintiff: O.F.C.C
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 1:2022cv02901
Filed: June 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Franklin U Valderrama
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 , set deadlines,,,, #6 (Ahmed, Aneesa)
July 27, 2022 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services by Aneesa Ahmed (Ahmed, Aneesa)
June 14, 2022 Filing 8 DESIGNATION of Elizabeth Inez Treacy as U.S. Attorney for Defendant U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (Treacy, Elizabeth)
June 14, 2022 Filing 7 DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendant U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (Oswald, Craig)
June 7, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to U.S. U.S Attorneys Oswald and Treacy) (emc, )
June 6, 2022 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 08/16/2022 the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report. Plaintiff must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. If the defendant(s) has not been served with process by that date, plaintiff's counsel is instructed to file an individual status report indicating the status of service of process by the same deadline. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Any nongovernmental corporate party that qualifies under the Rules is reminded of the requirement to file a disclosure statement under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1/N.D. Ill. Local Rule 3.2. Mailed notice (axc).
June 6, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (emc, )
June 6, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (emc, )
June 6, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (emc, )
June 2, 2022 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff O.F.C.C by Charles Roth (Roth, Charles)
June 2, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Selden, Frances)
June 2, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff O.F.C.C by Frances Drury Selden Appearance for Frances Drury Selden (Selden, Frances)
June 2, 2022 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff O.F.C.C by Lavanga Vusitha Wijekoon Appearance of Lavanga Wijekoon (Wijekoon, Lavanga)
June 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by O.F.C.C; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19525348.(Wijekoon, Lavanga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O.F.C.C. v U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O.F.C.C
Represented By: Charles Roth
Represented By: Frances Drury Selden
Represented By: Lavanga Vusitha Wijekoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Aneesa Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?