Center for Biological Diversity, Inc. et al v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity, Inc., The Hoosier Environmental Council, Inc. and Hoosier Environmental Council, Inc., The
Defendant: Martha Williams, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service and Deb Haaland
Case Number: 1:2022cv02989
Filed: June 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Referring Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 16 U.S.C. ยง 1538 Endangered Species Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendants Deb Haaland, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Martha Williams for extension of time (Furlong, Erika)
August 4, 2022 Filing 10 Parties' Joint NOTICE of Motion by Erika Furlong for presentment of before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 8/9/2022 at 09:30 AM. (Furlong, Erika)
July 29, 2022 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Deb Haaland, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Martha Williams by Erika Furlong (Furlong, Erika)
July 14, 2022 Filing 8 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso for all further proceedings. Honorable Virginia M. Kendall no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/14/2022. (ph, )
June 13, 2022 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Inc., Hoosier Environmental Council, Inc., The by Robert Adam Weinstock (Weinstock, Robert)
June 10, 2022 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial Status hearing set for 8/17/2022 at 9:15 AM which will proceed via Webex. Joint Status Report due by 8/12/2022. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Webex instructions are as follows: Prior to the hearing, you are directed to cut and paste this hyper link into a browser: https://us-courts.webex.com/join/virginia_kendallilnd.uscourts.gov. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (650)-479-3207, the access code is: 180 698 4009. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone and turn off your video until your case is called. If calling in due to not having access to a computer, please remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function. Please test the sound quality and video functions of your device in advance. Members of the public and media are directed to call in to listen to hearings. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Participant instructions for Webex are attached. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Webex Participant Instructions) (lk, )
June 8, 2022 Filing 5 CORRECTED COMPLAINT filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Inc., The Hoosier Environmental Council, Inc.; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19541835. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 D, #5 Exhibit E) (Templeton, Mark)
June 8, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Inc., The Hoosier Environmental Council, Inc. by Mark Norman Templeton (Templeton, Mark)
June 8, 2022 Filing 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs (Templeton, Mark)
June 8, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Templeton, Mark)
June 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Inc., The Hoosier Environmental Council, Inc.; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19541835. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 D, #5 Exhibit E)(Templeton, Mark)
June 8, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (emc, )
June 8, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (emc, )
June 8, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (emc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity, Inc. et al v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Norman Templeton
Represented By: Robert Adam Weinstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Hoosier Environmental Council, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Norman Templeton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hoosier Environmental Council, Inc., The
Represented By: Robert Adam Weinstock
Represented By: Mark Norman Templeton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Williams
Represented By: Erika Furlong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Erika Furlong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deb Haaland
Represented By: Erika Furlong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?