Garza v. Nestle USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Melissa Garza
Defendant: Nestle USA, Inc. and Gerber Products Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv03098
Filed: June 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2022 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Based on plaintiff's status report, the telephonic status hearing set for 8/9/2022 is vacated and reset to 9/7/2022 at 9:10 AM, using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. The joint status report required by the Court's initial order is to be filed on 8/31/2022. (mk)
August 2, 2022 Filing 9 STATUS Report by Melissa Garza (Sheehan, Spencer)
July 28, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Melissa Garza. Gerber Products Company waiver sent on 7/28/2022, answer due 9/26/2022. (Sheehan, Spencer)
July 23, 2022 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: By no later than 8/2/2022, the parties (or, if no defendant has yet appeared, the plaintiff(s)) are to file a joint status report that includes the following information: (1) the status of service of process upon each defendant; (2) a description of each party's claims and defenses; (3) details regarding any discussions concerning settlement, whether before or after the filing of the lawsuit; (4) a proposed discovery and pretrial schedule; and (5) any other matters that any party wishes to bring to the Court's attention. The case is set for a case management conference under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 on 8/9/2022 at 8:55 a.m. The case management conference will be conducted by telephone, using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to any defendant that has not yet appeared by counsel via regular mail at the address at which the defendant has been or is to be served with process. (mk)
July 11, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED complaint by Melissa Garza against Gerber Products Company (Sheehan, Spencer)
July 11, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Gerber Products Company (dxb, )
July 9, 2022 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint naming a new defendant #4 is granted, with summons to issue to newly named defendant Gerber Products Co. Plaintiff should now file the amended complaint as a separate docket entry. (mk)
July 8, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Melissa Garza to substitute party (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(Sheehan, Spencer)
June 15, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Nestle USA, Inc. (khg, )
June 14, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Melissa Garza by Spencer Sheehan (Sheehan, Spencer)
June 14, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sheehan, Spencer)
June 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Melissa Garza; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19560017.(Sheehan, Spencer)
June 14, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (emc, )
June 14, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (emc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garza v. Nestle USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Garza
Represented By: Spencer Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestle USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerber Products Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?