Harmon v. EYM Pizza of Illinois, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Adjhanna Harmon
Defendant: EYM Pizza of Illinois, LLC and Eduardo Diaz
Case Number: 1:2022cv03180
Filed: June 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Correction regarding SUBPOENA ISSUED events. (sxh, )
August 12, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Correction regarding SUMMONS ISSUED event. (sxh, )
August 10, 2022 ENTERED IN ERROR Modified on 8/12/2022 (sxh, ).
August 10, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Eduardo Diaz, EYM Pizza of Illinois, LLC (mbh, )
August 10, 2022 SUBPOENA Issued (mbh, )
June 21, 2022 Filing 2 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 8/23/2022 at 9:30 AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' website and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 8/16/2022. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll-free number). Please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
June 17, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (emc, )
June 17, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (emc, )
June 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury trial demanded filed by Adjhanna Harmon; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19571939. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons-Diaz, #4 Summons-EYM)(Mccarley, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harmon v. EYM Pizza of Illinois, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adjhanna Harmon
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Mccarley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EYM Pizza of Illinois, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduardo Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?