Sunco International Inc. et al v. Jiangsu Sunco Boiler Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Sunco International Inc. and Jiefeng Shan
Defendant: Jiangsu Sunco Boiler Co., Ltd., Jie Xu, Xiaofeng CAI, Meifang Chen, Xin Zhang, Guoping Xu and Yudong Xu
Case Number: 1:2022cv03818
Filed: July 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Referring Judge: Franklin U Valderrama
Nature of Suit: Defend Trade Secrets Act (of 2016)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2023 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: The Court has reviewed Plaintiffs' sixth supplemental status report on service. R. 22 at 1-2 ("Plaintiffs still are awaiting service of summons pursuant to the Hague Convention on two (2) of the seven (7) Defendants, each of whom are in China.... the [Chinese Ministry of Justice] reported that it reissued applications for service on Defendants Jiangsu Sunco Boiler Co., Ltd. and Jie Xu, that the Chinese Supreme Court has sent the applications of service to the Jiangsu provincial court to effectuate service, and that the services applications are still outstanding and in progress."). Plaintiffs shall file an updated status report about the progress of service on or before 6/26/2023. Mailed notice (ags)
May 25, 2023 Filing 22 STATUS Report SIXTH Supplemental Status Report on Service by Jiefeng Shan, Sunco International Inc. (Phillips, Louis)
April 26, 2023 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: The Court has reviewed Plaintiffs' fifth supplemental status report on service. R. 20 at 1 ("Plaintiffs still are awaiting service of summons pursuant to the Hague Convention on two (2) of the seven (7) Defendants, each of whom are in China.... [A] renewed request for service was submitted and has been transferred to the Supreme People's Court for further processing."). Plaintiffs shall file an updated status report about the progress of service on or before 5/25/2023. Emailed notice (axc).
April 25, 2023 Filing 20 STATUS Report Plaintiffs' Fifth Supplemental Status Report on Service by Jiefeng Shan, Sunco International Inc. (Phillips, Louis)
March 24, 2023 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: The Court has reviewed Plaintiffs' fourth supplemental status report on service. R. 18 at 1 ("Plaintiffs are awaiting service of summons pursuant to the Hague Convention on two (2) of the seven (7) Defendants, each of whom are in China."). Plaintiffs shall file an updated status report about the progress of service on or before 4/25/2023. Emailed notice (axc).
March 23, 2023 Filing 18 STATUS Report Plaintiffs' Fourth Supplemental Status Report on Service by Jiefeng Shan, Sunco International Inc. (Phillips, Louis)
February 21, 2023 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: The Court has reviewed Plaintiffs' third supplemental status report on service. R. 16 at 1 ("Plaintiffs are awaiting service of summons pursuant to the Hague Convention on three (3) of the seven (7) Defendants, each of whom are in China."). Plaintiffs shall file an updated status report about the progress of service on or before 3/23/2023. Mailed notice (smm)
February 20, 2023 Filing 16 STATUS Report Third Supplemental Status Report on Service by Jiefeng Shan, Sunco International Inc. (Phillips, Louis)
January 20, 2023 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: The Court has reviewed Plaintiffs' second supplemental status report on service. R. 14 at 1 ("Plaintiffs are still awaiting service of summons pursuant to the Hague Convention on five (5) of seven (7) Defendants, each of whom are in China."). Plaintiffs shall file an updated status report about the progress of service on or before 2/20/2023. Emailed notice (axc).
January 18, 2023 Filing 14 STATUS Report Second Supplemental Status Report on Service by Jiefeng Shan, Sunco International Inc. (Phillips, Louis)
December 29, 2022 Filing 13 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/29/2022: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 20, 2022 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's first supplemental status report on service. R. 11 ("The Supreme People's Court has not reported service on Defendants at this time."). Plaintiffs shall file an updated status report on or before 1/18/2023 informing the Court about the progress of service. Emailed notice (axc).
December 15, 2022 Filing 11 STATUS Report Plaintiffs' First Supplemental Status Report on Service by Jiefeng Shan, Sunco International Inc. (Phillips, Louis)
November 16, 2022 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: In their initial status report filed 11/15/2022, Plaintiffs state that Defendants, who are located in China, have not yet been served. While "[t]he Supreme People's Court requested local courts from each province and each major city where the Defendants live to serve the Defendants[,]" the "Supreme People's Court has not reported service on Defendants at this time." R. 9 at 4. Plaintiffs shall file an updated status report on or before 12/15/2022 informing the Court about the progress of service. Mailed notice (axc).
November 15, 2022 Filing 9 STATUS Report Plaintiffs' Initial Status Report by Jiefeng Shan, Sunco International Inc. (Phillips, Louis)
October 13, 2022 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 11/15/2022 the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report. Plaintiff must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. If the defendant(s) has not been served with process by that date, plaintiff's counsel is instructed to file an individual status report indicating the status of service of process by the same deadline. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Any nongovernmental corporate party that qualifies under the Rules is reminded of the requirement to file a disclosure statement under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1/N.D. Ill. Local Rule 3.2. Mailed notice (axc).
October 6, 2022 Filing 7 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: The Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. has retired from regular active service as a United States District Judge effective October 4, 2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED That the cases on the attached list are to be reassigned to the other judges of this Court as indicated, pursuant to Local Rule 40.1(f). IT IS ALSO ORDERED That any case that was assigned to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. and may require further judicial action in the future, shall be reassigned by lot to a judge of this Court. Case reassigned to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama for all further proceedings. Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 10/06/2022.(td, )
September 1, 2022 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Sunco International Inc. Supplement to Rule 7.1 and LR 3.2 (Phillips, Louis)
August 1, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Jiangsu Sunco Boiler Co., Ltd. (jb, Joshua)
July 29, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Xiaofeng CAI, Meifang Chen, Guoping Xu, Jie Xu, Yudong Xu, Xin Zhang (sxh, )
July 25, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ak, )
July 25, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ak, )
July 22, 2022 Filing 5 STATEMENT by Sunco International Inc. Rule 7.1 (Phillips, Louis)
July 22, 2022 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs (Phillips, Louis)
July 22, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Jiefeng Shan, Sunco International Inc. by Louis John Phillips (Phillips, Louis)
July 22, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Phillips, Louis)
July 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jiefeng Shan, Sunco International Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19676497.(Phillips, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sunco International Inc. et al v. Jiangsu Sunco Boiler Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunco International Inc.
Represented By: Louis John Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jiefeng Shan
Represented By: Louis John Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jiangsu Sunco Boiler Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jie Xu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiaofeng CAI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meifang Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xin Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guoping Xu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yudong Xu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?