American Guardian Warranty Services, Inc. v. Compass VSC LLC
Plaintiff: American Guardian Warranty Services, Inc.
Defendant: Compass VSC LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv03869
Filed: July 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by American Guardian Warranty Services, Inc.. Compass VSC LLC waiver sent on 7/27/2022, answer due 9/26/2022. (Tahmassebi, Amir)
August 17, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Attorney re: Lanham Act Mediation Materials (Tahmassebi, Amir)
August 3, 2022 Filing 8 Trademark Information Response Letter by American Guardian Warranty Services, Inc. (Tahmassebi, Amir)
July 27, 2022 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic initial status hearing set for 9/27/2022 at 9:15 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (dal, )
July 27, 2022 Filing 6 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (rc, )
July 27, 2022 Filing 5 MAILED (Patent or Trademark) Request Letter to Plaintiff's counsel Amir R. Tahmassebi. (rc, )
July 26, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff American Guardian Warranty Services, Inc. by Connor James Whitting (Whitting, Connor)
July 26, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff American Guardian Warranty Services, Inc. by Amir R. Tahmassebi (Tahmassebi, Amir)
July 26, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Tahmassebi, Amir)
July 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by American Guardian Warranty Services, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19683211.(Tahmassebi, Amir)
July 26, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (dxb, )
July 26, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Guardian Warranty Services, Inc. v. Compass VSC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Guardian Warranty Services, Inc.
Represented By: Connor James Whitting
Represented By: Amir R. Tahmassebi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass VSC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?