Long v. Layma, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tonia Long
Defendant: Layma, LLC, also known as Layama, LLC, and doing business as Little Lake Lending, Layama, LLC, and doing business as Little Lake Lending, Ben G. Ray, III, John Does 1-20, Layma, LLC also known as Layama, LLC doing business as Little Lake Lending and Layama, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv04365
Filed: August 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2022 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Layma, LLC, Ben G. Ray, III by Saba Bazzazieh (Bazzazieh, Saba)
October 12, 2022 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Layma, LLC, Ben G. Ray, III by Nicole Marie St. Germain (St. Germain, Nicole)
October 11, 2022 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motions to appear pro hac vice #12 #13 are granted. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 6, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19918664. (Grant, Michael)
October 6, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19918648. (Grant, Michael)
October 6, 2022 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Unopposed motion for extension of time #10 is granted. Defendants Layma, LLC and Ben G. Ray, III are to respond to plaintiff's complaint by 10/20/2022. The 10/20/2022 joint status report deadline is extended to 11/3/2022. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
October 6, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendants Layma, LLC, Ben G. Ray, III for extension of time (Unopposed) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grant, Michael)
October 6, 2022 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Layma, LLC, Ben G. Ray, III by Michael Grant (Grant, Michael)
September 29, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tonia Long as to Ben G. Ray, III on 9/15/2022, answer due 10/6/2022. (Goldstein, Matthew)
September 29, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tonia Long as to Layma, LLC on 9/15/2022, answer due 10/6/2022. (Goldstein, Matthew)
August 18, 2022 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: By 10/20/2022, the parties are to file a joint status report. The parties may refer to the format detailed on the Court's website under New and Reassigned cases. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 17, 2022 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tonia Long by Tara Leigh Goodwin (Goodwin, Tara)
August 17, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tonia Long by Matthew J. Goldstein (Goldstein, Matthew)
August 17, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tonia Long by Dulijaza Clark (Clark, Dulijaza)
August 17, 2022 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tonia Long by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel)
August 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION filed by Tonia Long; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19752326. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-G, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Edelman, Daniel)
August 17, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jk2, )
August 17, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Layma, LLC, also known as Layama, LLC, and doing business as Little Lake Lending, Ben G. Ray, III (jk2, )
August 17, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jk2, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long v. Layma, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Layma, LLC, also known as Layama, LLC, and doing business as Little Lake Lending
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Layama, LLC, and doing business as Little Lake Lending
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben G. Ray, III
Represented By: Saba Bazzazieh
Represented By: Michael Grant
Represented By: Nicole Marie St. Germain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Layma, LLC also known as Layama, LLC doing business as Little Lake Lending
Represented By: Saba Bazzazieh
Represented By: Michael Grant
Represented By: Nicole Marie St. Germain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Layama, LLC
Represented By: Saba Bazzazieh
Represented By: Michael Grant
Represented By: Nicole Marie St. Germain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonia Long
Represented By: Dulijaza Clark
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldstein
Represented By: Tara Leigh Goodwin
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?